Hall v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Heather Lynn Hall
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00861
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Heather Lynn Hall. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 7/24/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Lane, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Reeves, T)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/9/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 5, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heather Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to proceed IFP, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lane, Matthew)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Heather Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Heather Lynn Hall(pty:pla))(aty,Lane, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lynn Hall
Represented By: Matthew David Lane, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?