Bruno v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Madison Bruno and M Bruno
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 6:2019cv00886
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by M Bruno. Service made upon: U S Attorney;. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Murphy, Suzette)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by M Bruno. Service made upon: U S Attorney General;. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Murphy, Suzette)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by M Bruno. Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration served on 8/14/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Murphy, Suzette)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/15/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Madison Bruno. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murphy, Suzette)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Madison Bruno. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Attorney Suzette Tagesen Murphy added to party Madison Bruno(pty:pla))(aty,Murphy, Suzette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruno v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Bruno
Represented By: Suzette Tagesen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Bruno
Represented By: Suzette Tagesen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?