Migues v. We Care Homes Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez and Ashley Walker
Defendant: We Care Homes Inc and Kyle Jones
Case Number: 6:2019cv00976
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Memo In Support of Motion to Certify Class with Table of Contents & Authorities filed by Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker regarding #9 MOTION to Certify Class . (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/23/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency to Philip Bohrer on behalf of Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker regarding #9 MOTION to Certify Class . Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Certify Class . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Certify Class by Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proposed order)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/20/2019 to indicate a deficiency (JonesSld, P). Modified on 9/23/2019 to remove deficiency and indicate SEE #12 Corrective Document, Memorandum with Table of Contents & Authorities (JonesSld, P).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nellie Migues, Ashley Walker of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form of Samantha Miguez)(aty,Bohrer, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by We Care Homes Inc. (aty,Basden, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kyle Jones, We Care Homes Inc.(Attorney Timothy W Basden added to party Kyle Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy W Basden added to party We Care Homes Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Basden, Timothy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Nellie Migues of Filing Consent to Sue by Ashley Walker (Attachments: #1 Consent Form of Ashley Walker)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nellie Migues. Kyle Jones served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; We Care Homes Inc served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY TO CAPTURE ANSWER DUE DATE, SEE PDF ATTACHED TO DOCUMENTS #3 & #4 . (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on We Care Homes, Inc. on 08/05/2019, filed by Nellie Migues. Answer due 8/26/2019. (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add answer due date (JonesSld, P).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Kyle Jones on 08/05/2019, filed by Nellie Migues. Answer due 8/26/2019. (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add answer due date (JonesSld, P).
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kyle Jones, We Care Homes Inc (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kyle Jones, We Care Homes Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4010096) filed by Nellie Migues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Nellie Migues(pty:pla))(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Migues v. We Care Homes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Migues
Represented By: Scott Earl Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Miguez
Represented By: Scott Earl Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Walker
Represented By: Scott Earl Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Care Homes Inc
Represented By: Timothy W Basden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Jones
Represented By: Timothy W Basden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?