Jacobs v. U S A A Casualty Insurance Co
Plaintiff: April Jacobs
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company and U S A A Casualty Insurance Co
Consolidated Defendant: Michael m. Thompson and Mason C. Johnson
Consolidated Plaintiff: J.P. D'Albor
Case Number: 6:2019cv01063
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Removal Order by U S A A Casualty Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Index of State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Counsel)(aty,Johnson, Mason) Modified on 9/17/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U S A A Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Johnson, Mason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by U S A A Casualty Insurance Co.(aty,Johnson, Mason)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/16/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Michael Mann Thompson, Mason Cire Johnson on behalf of U S A A Casualty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/29/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. U S A A Casualty Insurance Co answer due 8/22/2019. ADMINIST5RATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20193771 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4024504) filed by Mason C. Johnson, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages, #4 Exhibit Louisiana Orthopaedic Specialist record from March 11, 2019, #5 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's January 11, 2019 Settlement demand, #7 Exhibit Medical bills from Louisiana Orthopedic Specialists, Park Place Surgical Hospital; and Barczyk, #8 Exhibit State of Louisiana Uniform Motor Vehicle Crash Report no. 171128183500125)(Attorney Mason Cire Johnson added to party Mason C. Johnson(pty:condft), Attorney Mason Cire Johnson added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Johnson, Mason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. U S A A Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Michael m. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mason C. Johnson
Represented By: Mason Cire Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mason Cire Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S A A Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael Mann Thompson
Represented By: Mason Cire Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: J.P. D'Albor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Jacobs
Represented By: Jean Paul D'Albor
Represented By: Gordon Van Greig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?