Jones v. Scott
Plaintiff: Michael D Jones, Jr
Defendant: Paul Scott
Case Number: 6:2019cv01074
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/6/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael D Jones, Jr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Paul Scott filed by Michael D Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Paul Scott filed by Michael D Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A). Complaint not on approved forms.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?