Poydras v. Iberia Bank Corp
Plaintiff: Quonzel Poydras
Defendant: Iberia Bank Corp and Iberiabank Corp
Case Number: 6:2019cv01171
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 11/27/2019 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Iberiabank Corp re #10 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Compel,. (aty,Bremenstul, Minia)
October 11, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iberia Bank Corp. (aty,Bremenstul, Minia)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Iberiabank Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Maria Manuel, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Donna Domec)(Attorney Minia Elizabeth Bremenstul added to party Iberia Bank Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Bremenstul, Minia) Modified on 10/11/2019 to modify filer and indicate #12 Proposed Order submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/1/2019. (crt,Nations, S)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quonzel Poydras. Iberia Bank Corp served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iberia Bank Corp. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled First Page of Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quonzel Poydras. (crt,Crick, S)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency to Quonzel Poydras regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason: Incomplete IFP application. (crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poydras v. Iberia Bank Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quonzel Poydras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Bank Corp
Represented By: Minia Elizabeth Bremenstul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberiabank Corp
Represented By: Minia Elizabeth Bremenstul
Represented By: Tracy E Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?