Aspen Specialty Insurance Co v. Forest River R V Inc et al
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company and Aspen Specialty Insurance Co
Defendant: Forest River RV, Inc., Mikell Marks, American Western Home Ins. Co., Michael Dwayne Marks, Progressive Security Ins. Co., Forest River R V Inc, Progressive Security Insurance Co and American Western Home Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01199
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Torian, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Western Home Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Midland Co, Corporate Parent American Modern Home Insurance Co, Corporate Parent American Modern Insurance Group Inc, Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp, Corporate Parent Munchener Ruckversicherungs-Gesellschaft Aktiengesellschaft for American Western Home Insurance Co. (aty,Aydell, Blaine) Modified on 10/22/2019 to correct Corporate Parent (Dauterive, C).
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #14 Motion to Dismiss, sent to William Ransom Pipes, Blaine Thomas Aydell on behalf of American Western Home Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2019. (crt,Jones, P)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 12/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corp, Other Affiliate Drive Insurance Holdings Inc for Progressive Security Insurance Co. (aty,Briney, Patrick)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint,by Michael Dwayne Marks, Mikell Marks, Progressive Security Insurance Co, American Western Home Insurance Co.(aty,Briney, Patrick) Modified on 10/17/2019 to add filer (Jones, P).
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Dwayne Marks, Mikell Marks, Progressive Security Insurance Co, American Western Home Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(Attorney Patrick J Briney added to party Michael Dwayne Marks, Mikell Marks, Progressive Security Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Briney, Patrick) Modified on 10/17/2019 to capture more accurate event and edit text (Jones, P).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Timothy J Fagan for Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/15/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Britta Anne Sahlstorm for Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/15/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co of Notice of Addresses re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Britta Anne Sahlstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4071808), #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Timothy J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4071924) (aty,Torian, Robert)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Robert E Torian on behalf of Aspen Specialty Insurance Co regarding #10 Notice of Deficiency. Action taken: Document modified to reflect issued in error. Proposed Orders referred for signing. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 ISSUED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Deficiency to Robert E Torian on behalf of Aspen Specialty Insurance Co regarding #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Britta Anne Sahlstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4071808), #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Timothy J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4071924). Reason: An original signature of an attorney requesting admission is required by Fed.R.Civ.P.11. If filed in paper, a photocopy, signature stamp, FAX copy of a signature or signature "by permission" is not deemed by the judges of this district to fulfill the requirements of this rule. Please provide a proper signature page for this document. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to reflect issued in error on 10/15/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Michael Dwayne Marks waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (aty,Torian, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Mikell Marks waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (aty,Torian, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Progressive Security Insurance Co waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (aty,Torian, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Timothy J. Fagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4071924) by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 2)(aty,Torian, Robert) Modified to reflect deficient status on 10/10/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 10/15/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Britta Anne Sahlstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4071808) by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 2)(aty,Torian, Robert) Modified to reflect deficient status on 10/10/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 10/15/2019 (Bunting, M).
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. Forest River R V Inc waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (aty,Torian, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Western Home Insurance Co, Forest River R V Inc, Michael Dwayne Marks, Mikell Marks, Progressive Security Insurance Co (crt,Bunting, M)
September 12, 2019 Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst added. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (aty,Torian, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Breach of Duty of Good Faith and for Declaratory Judgment against American Western Home Ins Co, Forest River R V Inc, Michael Dwayne Marks, Mikell Marks, Progressive Security Ins Co. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4047972) filed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Attorney Robert E Torian added to party Aspen Specialty Insurance Co(pty:pla))(aty,Torian, Robert) Modified docket text on 9/13/2019 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen Specialty Insurance Co v. Forest River R V Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Timothy J Fagan
Represented By: Robert E Torian
Represented By: Britta Anne Sahlstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River RV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikell Marks
Represented By: Patrick J Briney
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Western Home Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dwayne Marks
Represented By: Patrick J Briney
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River R V Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Patrick J Briney
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Western Home Insurance Co
Represented By: Blaine Thomas Aydell
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?