Clark v. Sampson Estate et al
Plaintiff: James Kenneth Clark
Defendant: Space City Aviators, American National Property & Casualty Company, David L Norman, Marcus Todd Sampson Estate, X Y Z Insurance Co, Mackem Aviation L L C and American National Property & Casualty Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01202
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, with consent sought but not yet obtained by James Kenneth Clark. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed pleading, #3 Text of proposed order)(aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time with Which to Serve Vallie Matix with consent sought but not yet obtained by James Kenneth Clark. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Kenneth Clark. Marcus Todd Sampson Estate served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marcus Todd Sampson Estate. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 15, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marcus Todd Sampson Estate, requested by James Kenneth Clark. (aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by American National Property & Casualty Co, Mackem Aviation L L C, David L Norman . (aty,Bergeron, Nicholas)
September 30, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Kenneth Clark. Marcus Todd Sampson Estate served, via Long Arm Statute, in 15th JDC Vermilion Parish, case number 107122-A on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/22/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event which calculates answer due date. See pdf document filed as #12 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition and Citation from 15th JDC, Vermilion Parish, LA served on Estate of MArcus Todd Sampson through Dependent Administratrix, Vallie Matix, through counsel of record, Andrew A. Lewis on 08/23/2019, filed by James Kenneth Clark. (aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and to Continue Deadlines on Defendants' Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, which was set for November 14, 2019 is hereby CONTINUED WITHOUT DATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/27/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and to Continue Deadlines on Defendants' Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss filed by James Kenneth Clark regarding #9 Notice of Deficiency,, . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Rule 7.4.1 W Certificate, #4 Text of proposed order)(aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency to Gordon James Schoeffler on behalf of James Kenneth Clark regarding #8 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Discovery for Jurisdictional Purposes. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss, MOTION for Discovery for Jurisdictional Purposes with consent sought but not obtained by James Kenneth Clark. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of proposed order)(aty,Schoeffler, Gordon) Modified on 9/26/2019 to edit text and indicate deficiency (JonesSld, P). Modified on 9/27/2019 to remove deficiency notation - see doc #10 Corrective Document and to include consent language(Williams, L).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 9/24/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 11/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by American National Property & Casualty Co, Mackem Aviation L L C, David L Norman. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - David. L. Norman Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Daivd Jones Affidavit)(aty,McAloon, Leo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American National Property & Casualty Company. (aty,Bergeron, Nicholas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Vermilion, Case Number 107122 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4048738) filed by Space City Aviators, David L Norman, American National Property & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Consent to Removal, #3 State court petition Ex A)(Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party American National Property & Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party David L Norman(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Space City Aviators(pty:dft))(aty,Bergeron, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Sampson Estate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kenneth Clark
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Gary J Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Space City Aviators
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Norman
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Represented By: Leo R McAloon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Todd Sampson Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackem Aviation L L C
Represented By: Leo R McAloon, III
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property & Casualty Co
Represented By: Leo R McAloon, III
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?