Jones v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Co et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Jones
Defendant: Malaga Trans, Inc., Walter Malaga, Grand Slam Trucking, Inc, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Malaga Trans Inc and Grand Slam Trucking Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv01313
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2020 11:30 AM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/24/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 12/30/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 1/21/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 6/19/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 5/20/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 6/19/2020. Discovery deadline 7/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2020. Daubert Motions due by 8/18/2020. Motions in Limine due by 11/16/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/16/2020. Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2020. Bench Books due by 12/2/2020. Trial Depositions due by 12/2/2020. Real Time glossary due by 12/9/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 12/9/2020. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 12/3/2019. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/3/2019. Following discussion, a trial date of January 11, 2021 and a pretrial date of December 16, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. were selected. A scheduling order will be issued. (crt,Guidry, C)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on December 3, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2019 10:30 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grand Slam Trucking Inc, Walter Malaga, Malaga Trans Inc, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.(aty,Cherry, Darrell)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Grand Slam Trucking Inc, Walter Malaga, Malaga Trans Inc, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co . (Attachments: #1 State court petition)(aty,Cherry, Darrell)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Grand Slam Trucking Inc, Walter Malaga, Malaga Trans Inc, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/9/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/9/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Grand Slam Trucking, Inc, Walter Malaga, Malaga Trans, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cherry, Darrell)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Slam Trucking Inc, Malaga Trans Inc and Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (aty,Cherry, Darrell) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add Corporate Parents Starr Global Financial Inc, Starr Global Holdings A G and Starr International Co Inc to Starr Indemnity & Liability Co (Dauterive, C).
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to David Kirk Groome, Jr, Darrell Keith Cherry on behalf of Grand Slam Trucking, Inc, Malaga Trans, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/22/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC - Acadia Parish, Case Number 2019-10827 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4069320) filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, Walter Malaga, Malaga Trans, Inc., Grand Slam Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit State Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Affidavit)(Attorney Darrell Keith Cherry added to party Grand Slam Trucking, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Keith Cherry added to party Walter Malaga(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Keith Cherry added to party Malaga Trans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Darrell Keith Cherry added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Co(pty:dft))(aty,Cherry, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malaga Trans, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell Keith Cherry
Represented By: David Kirk Groome, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Malaga
Represented By: Darrell Keith Cherry
Represented By: David Kirk Groome, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Slam Trucking, Inc
Represented By: Darrell Keith Cherry
Represented By: David Kirk Groome, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Co
Represented By: Darrell Keith Cherry
Represented By: David Kirk Groome, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malaga Trans Inc
Represented By: Darrell Keith Cherry
Represented By: David Kirk Groome, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Slam Trucking Inc
Represented By: Darrell Keith Cherry
Represented By: David Kirk Groome, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jones
Represented By: Richard F Zimmerman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?