Kennerson v. Creswell Plaza L L C et al
Plaintiff: Tamika Kennerson
Defendant: Creswell Plaza LLC, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, The Hertz Corporation, Creswell Plaza L L C and Hertz Corp
Intervenor Plaintiff: Farmington Casualty Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01340
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hertz Corp identifying Corporate Parent Hertz Global Holdings Inc for Hertz Corp. (aty,Kaplan, Howard)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Hertz Corp.(Attorney Howard B Kaplan added to party Hertz Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Kaplan, Howard)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hertz Corp (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Tamika Kennerson, Creswell Plaza L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Hertz Corp filed by Farmington Casualty Co.(crt,Crick, S) Modified on 11/20/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/19/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farmington Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parents, Travelers Companies Inc, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Corp, for Farmington Casualty Co. (aty,Martinez, John) Modified on 11/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene with consent by Farmington Casualty Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney John W Martinez added to party Farmington Casualty Co(pty:mov))(aty,Martinez, John) Modified on 11/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Creswell Plaza L L C. (aty,Garbarino, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc for Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. (aty,Garbarino, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/16/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Joseph H Garbarino on behalf of Creswell Plaza L L C, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/29/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 11, 2019 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Creswell Plaza LLC, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, The Hertz Corporation filed in the 27th JDC, Parish of St. Landry by Plaintiff Tamika Kennerson. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image found in this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #7 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
October 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Creswell Plaza L L C in the 27th JDC, Parish of St. Landry. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #5 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 11, 2019 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed in the 27th JDC, Parish of St. Landry by Creswell Plaza L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment 6 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC, St. Landry Parish, Case Number 19-C-1159 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4073406) filed by Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, Creswell Plaza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Compliance, #3 Exhibit Damages, #4 State court petition Citation, Petition, and Discovery, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Amended Answer, #7 State court petition Amended)(Attorney Joseph H Garbarino added to party Creswell Plaza LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Garbarino added to party Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd(pty:dft))(aty,Garbarino, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennerson v. Creswell Plaza L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creswell Plaza LLC
Represented By: Joseph H Garbarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Represented By: Joseph H Garbarino
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creswell Plaza L L C
Represented By: Joseph H Garbarino
Represented By: Julie Eustis Vaicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corp
Represented By: Stephen N Elliott
Represented By: Howard B Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamika Kennerson
Represented By: John Derek Aswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Farmington Casualty Co
Represented By: John W Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?