Hebert v. Insurance Co of the State of Pennsylvania et al
Plaintiff: Angela K. Hebert and Angela K Hebert
Defendant: David Cherry, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, J & M Tank Lines Inc and Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 6:2019cv01600
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Phayer, Dennis)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania.(aty,Phayer, Dennis)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parents, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, A I G Property Casualty Inc, American International Group of Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania. (aty,Phayer, Dennis) Modified on 12/17/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Dennis J Phayer, Jonathan H Adams on behalf of Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC, St. Martin Parish, Case Number 88816 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4134159) filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition)(Attorney Dennis J Phayer added to party Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania(pty:dft))(aty,Phayer, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. Insurance Co of the State of Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&M Tank Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jonathan H Adams
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & M Tank Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jonathan H Adams
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela K. Hebert
Represented By: Andrew J Quackenbos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela K Hebert
Represented By: Andrew J Quackenbos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?