Coburn et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Thibodeaux and Jillian Coburn
Defendant: Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles Inc and Thomas McVeigh Smith
Case Number: 6:2020cv00105
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles. (aty,Foreman, L)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Answer to Complaint, sent to Kevin J Koenig, L Paul Foreman on behalf of Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/2/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles Inc.(Attorney Kevin J Koenig added to party Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles(pty:dft))(aty,Koenig, Kevin) Modified to correct filer on 3/19/2020 (Thomas, T).
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette.(aty,Dozier, Gilbert) Modified to correct filer name on 3/19/2020 (Thomas, T).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that The Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette, Inc be granted 20 day extension to file response pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/14/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc. (aty,Dozier, Gilbert)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Gilbert H Dozier added to party Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Dozier, Gilbert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas McVeigh Smith, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles Inc. (crt,Whidden, C)
January 22, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Whidden, C)
January 22, 2020 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas McVeigh Smith, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles Inc, requested by Jillian Coburn, Kathryn Thibodeaux. (aty,Ducote, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2020 to modify docket text (Whidden, C).
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas McVeigh Smith, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4161146) filed by Jillian Coburn, Kathryn Thibodeaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Richard L Ducote added to party Jillian Coburn(pty:pla), Attorney Richard L Ducote added to party Kathryn Thibodeaux(pty:pla))(aty,Ducote, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2020 to modify docket text (Whidden, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coburn et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Thibodeaux
Represented By: Richard L Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Coburn
Represented By: Richard L Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lafayette Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McVeigh Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?