Alfred v. F C A US L L C et al
Plaintiff: Shelton Joseph Alfred, Jr
Defendant: Sterling Automotive Group Inc and F C A U S L L C
Case Number: 6:2020cv00379
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Sterling Automotive Group Inc answer due 4/1/2020. Citation Return (15th JDC, Parish of Lafayette, filed 2/11/20) (crt,Bunting, M)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by F C A U S L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Bryant, Camille)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by F C A U S L L C.(aty,Bryant, Camille)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F C A U S L L C corporate parent F C A North America Holdings L L C, corporate parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N V. (aty,Bryant, Camille) Modified to add corporate parent on 3/31/2020 (Bunting, M).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/26/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/26/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Camille R Bryant, Gary G Hebert on behalf of F C A U S L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/9/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number J20200710 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4219895) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal)(Attorney Camille R Bryant added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Bryant, Camille) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/26/2020) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfred v. F C A US L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Joseph Alfred, Jr
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Automotive Group Inc
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C A U S L L C
Represented By: Gary G Hebert
Represented By: Camille R Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?