Kearns v. Progressive Security Insurance Co, et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Kearns
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Co, Kenneth Martez Padgett and Progressive Specialty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv00431
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Kearns. Kenneth Martez Padgett served on 5/2/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Colomb, Brian)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent, Progressive Corp for Progressive Specialty Insurance Co, by Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,MacDonald, Ian) Modified on 4/17/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Answer to Complaint sent to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Progressive Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,MacDonald, Ian) Modified on 4/15/2020 to modify docket text and party. (Crick, S).
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Kearns. Progressive Security Insurance Co waiver sent on 4/7/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (aty,Colomb, Brian)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Martez Padgett, Progressive Security Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S)
April 7, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Martez Padgett, Progressive Security Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4228764) filed by Michelle Kearns. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Brian C Colomb added to party Michelle Kearns(pty:clm))(aty,Colomb, Brian) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/7/2020 to correct fillable form. ) (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearns v. Progressive Security Insurance Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Martez Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Kearns
Represented By: Brian C Colomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?