College A D L L C v. Winthrop Intelligence L L C
Plaintiff: College AD, LLC
Defendant: Winthrop Intelligence, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00540
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by College A D L L C. (aty,Melasky, Mark)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Mark Norman Melasky, Gregory D Latham on behalf of College A D L L C. Show Cause Response due by 5/28/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (crt,Crick, S)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Winthrop Intelligence L L C. (crt,Crick, S)
April 30, 2020 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred when filing the #1 Complaint. A refund of the initial payment of $400.00, receipt number ALAWDC-4249961, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Mark Norman Melasky on behalf of College A D L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/13/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
April 29, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Winthrop Intelligence L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4249992) filed by College A D L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet, #5 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Mark Norman Melasky added to party College A D L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Melasky, Mark) Modified on 4/30/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: College A D L L C v. Winthrop Intelligence L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop Intelligence, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College AD, LLC
Represented By: Mark Norman Melasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?