Scully et al v. Andrus
Appellant: Crystal Ann Scully, Joshua Cheramie, Rae Ann Scully Richie, Jared Cheramie, Sean Christian Torgrimson, Sr, Lynze T Belle, Jeffery A Richie, KRC Properties, LLC, Shirley H Scully, Kathy Scully Petty, Raymond J Scully, Jr and K R C Properties L L C
Appellee: Elizabeth Andrus
Case Number: 6:2020cv00543
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. Consideration of Bankruptcy Appeal set for 10/15/2020 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Bankruptcy Hearing held on 3/31/2020 before Bankruptcy Judge John W. Kolwe. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherryl Robinson, Telephone number 504-348-3704. Total pages: 53. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2020. (crt,Carpenter, K)
June 9, 2020 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. (crt,Carpenter, K)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT: USBC Record Doc 95 Trial Documents re #2 Bankruptcy Designation of Record on Appeal/Withdraw Reference. (crt,Williams, L)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with transcript request by Lynze T Belle, Jared Cheramie, Joshua Cheramie, K R C Properties L L C, Kathy Scully Petty, Jeffery A Richie, Rae Ann Scully Richie, Crystal Ann Scully, Raymond J Scully, Jr, Shirley H Scully, Sean Christian Torgrimson, Sr (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 94 Part 1, #2 BK Doc 94 Part 2, #3 BK Doc 94 Part 3, #4 BK Doc 94 Part 4, #5 BK Doc 94 Part 5, #6 BK Doc 94 Part 6, #7 BK Doc 94 Part 7, #8 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Carpenter, K)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with transcript request by Lynze T Belle, Jared Cheramie, Joshua Cheramie, K R C Properties L L C, Kathy Scully Petty, Jeffery A Richie, Rae Ann Scully Richie, Crystal Ann Scully, Raymond J Scully, Jr, Shirley H Scully, Sean Christian Torgrimson, Sr (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 1,44,51,65-67,73,75,83-85, #2 BK Docs 87,89,90,92,98,99,103,105,110,111, #3 BK Doc 97 Transcript of Trial)(crt,Carpenter, K)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 4/15/2020 signed by Bankruptcy Judge John W Kolwe filed by Kathy Scully Petty, Joshua Cheramie, Sean Christian Torgrimson, Sr, Shirley H Scully, Rae Ann Scully Richie, KRC Properties, LLC, Jeffery A Richie, Raymond J Scully, Jr, Lynze T Belle, Jared Cheramie, Crystal Ann Scully. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 BK Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Carpenter, K)
April 29, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scully et al v. Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Crystal Ann Scully
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joshua Cheramie
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rae Ann Scully Richie
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jared Cheramie
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sean Christian Torgrimson, Sr
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lynze T Belle
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jeffery A Richie
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KRC Properties, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shirley H Scully
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kathy Scully Petty
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Raymond J Scully, Jr
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: K R C Properties L L C
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Elizabeth Andrus
Represented By: Catherine Elena Lasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?