Sterling Automotive Group Inc et al v. Ramayo
Plaintiff: Sterling Automotive Group, Inc., Arthur C. LeBlanc, Jr., Sterling Automotive Group Inc doing business as Sterling Premium Select and Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr
Defendant: Edgardo Ramayo
Case Number: 6:2020cv00809
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Edgardo Ramayo . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Automotive Group Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit GoDaddy.com, LLC Records, #3 Proposed order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion for Default Judgment)(aty,Ottinger, Patrick)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Edgardo Ramayo by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Automotive Group Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Arthur C. LeBlanc, Jr., #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeff Cook)(aty,Ottinger, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Edgardo Ramayo (crt,Bunting, M)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Edgardo Ramayo by Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr, Sterling Automotive Group Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Guidry, Valerie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sterling Automotive Group Inc, Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr. Edgardo Ramayo served on 6/27/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Automotive Group Inc. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edgardo Ramayo. (crt,Jones, P)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (crt,Crick, S)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Patrick Stephen Ottinger on behalf of Sterling Automotive Group Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/9/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edgardo Ramayo (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4304098) filed by Sterling Automotive Group, Inc, Arthur C LeBlanc Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Valerie Vige Guidry added to party Arthur C. LeBlanc, Jr(pty:pla), Sterling Automotive Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Guidry, Valerie) Modified on 6/25/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling Automotive Group Inc et al v. Ramayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Ramayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: William Winfield Stagg
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur C. LeBlanc, Jr.
Represented By: William Winfield Stagg
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Automotive Group Inc doing business as Sterling Premium Select
Represented By: William Winfield Stagg
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur C LeBlanc, Jr
Represented By: William Winfield Stagg
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?