Blanchard v Rig 77-B
Plaintiff: Ted Blanchard
Defendant: Rig 77-B
Case Number: 6:2020cv00884
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:0740
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding (9 in 6:20-cv-00995-JDC-CBW, 7 in 6:20-cv-01049-JDC-CBW, 7 in 6:20-cv-01056-JDC-CBW, 20 in 6:20-cv-00884-JDC-CBW) Notice. Action taken: Please disregard the Notice issued this date regarding suspension of proceedings and deadlines. This notice applies to Lake Charles Division cases only. (crt,Whidden, C)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE REGARDING HURRICANE LAURA: The Lake Charles area sustained extensive damage due to Hurricane Laura, including the Edwin F. Hunter, Jr. Courthouse. All proceedings and deadlines due within the next 30 days before Judge Cain are suspended. All proceedings and deadlines due before Magistrate Judge Kay remain as previously set. The court will advise of resettings in due course on a per-case basis via CM/ECF. Parties are encouraged to electronically file for relief or extensions, but if unable to do so, to call chambers and leave a message. Your message will be responded to promptly. (crt,Dunford, T)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF Service by USM for Release of Vessel Rig 77-B per #18 Order. Served on 8/25/20. (crt,Reeves, T)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Release Vessel by Owners Providing Surety Bond; granting #17 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/13/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #17 MOTION for Release Vessel By Owners Providing Surety Bond MOTION to Expedite. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Jones, P)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Release Vessel By Owners Providing Surety Bond by Rig 77-B. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Surety Bond, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Mouton, Charles). Added MOTION to Expedite on 8/12/2020 (Jones, P). Modified on 8/12/2020 to add event and edit text (Jones, P).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Expedite and #13 Motion for Bond. Parker Drilling Offshore USA, L L C is ordered to post bond of $500,000. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/4/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Bond filed by Ted Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rhine, Eric)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Publication Pursuant to Rule C(4) of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralyy and Maritime Claims by Ted Blanchard (Attachments: #1 Public Notice, #2 Affidavit of Scott M. Mansfield)(aty,Mansfield, Scott) Modified on 8/3/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 3, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #13 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Bond . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Jones, P)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Bond (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/3/2020.) by Rig 77-B. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed order)(Attorney Charles A Mouton added to party Rig 77-B(pty:dft))(aty,Mouton, Charles)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 SEIZURE WARRANT Returned Executed. Served on Rig 77-B, Port of Amelia, Louisiana on 7/30/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian, Ocean Marine Brokerage Services Inc appointed. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/28/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 WARRANT to Seize a Vessel issued (crt,Jones, P)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/28/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Ted Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Blanchard, #2 Exhibit 2-Incident Report, #3 Exhibit 3-Lonestar Orthopedics Report)(aty,Rhine, Eric)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER, Before the Court is "Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Warrant for Arrest" (Rec. 2) In order for the Court to properly consider the motion, Plaintiff, through counsel shall file an additional memorandum regarding the facts and supporting legal authority to establish that Plaintiff has met his prima facie showing of a maritime lien and is entitled to the arrest of the vessel at this stage of the litigation no later than 8/4/2020.). Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/21/2020. (crt,Petrofes, T)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Custodian with Proposed Order by Ted Blanchard. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Mansfield, Scott) Modified on 7/17/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rig 77-B. (crt,Jones, P)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Eric J Rhine for Ted Blanchard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/15/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
July 14, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #3 MOTION for Eric J. Rhineto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4321864). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
July 14, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Eric J. Rhineto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4321864) by Ted Blanchard. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Affidavit of Eric J. Rhine, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Mansfield, Scott) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/15/2020) (Jones, P). Modified on 7/15/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Ted Blanchard. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed Warrant)(aty,Mansfield, Scott) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/15/2020) (Jones, P). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/15/2020) (Jones, P). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/15/2020) (Jones, P). Modified on 7/15/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rig 77-B (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4321713) filed by Ted Blanchard. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Scott M. Mansfield, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Scott Michael Mansfield added to party Ted Blanchard(pty:selreq))(aty,Mansfield, Scott) Modified on 7/15/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard v Rig 77-B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rig 77-B
Represented By: Charles A Mouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Blanchard
Represented By: Eric J Rhine
Represented By: Collin Roy Melancon
Represented By: Scott Michael Mansfield
Represented By: Seth Thomas Mansfield
Represented By: Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?