O'Neil v. Fieldwood Energy L L C et al
Plaintiff: Toys O'Neil
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy L L C and Island Operating Co Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00912
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING HURRICANE LAURA: The Lake Charles area sustained extensive damage due to Hurricane Laura, including the Edwin F. Hunter, Jr. Courthouse. All proceedings and deadlines due within the next 30 days before Judge Cain are suspended. All proceedings and deadlines due before Magistrate Judge Kay remain as previously set. The court will advise of resettings in due course on a per-case basis via CM/ECF. Parties are encouraged to electronically file for relief or extensions, but if unable to do so, to call chambers and leave a message. Your message will be responded to promptly. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fieldwood Energy L L C. (aty,Bercaw, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Suggestion of Bankruptcy sent to James D Bercaw on behalf of Fieldwood Energy L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/19/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Fieldwood Energy LLC by Fieldwood Energy L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Bankruptcy under Chapter 11)(aty,Bercaw, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toys O'Neil. Fieldwood Energy L L C served on 7/29/2020. Answer due 8/19/2020. Island Operating Co Inc served on 7/29/2020. Answer due 8/19/2020. (aty,David, Blake) (Main Document 4 rotated and replaced on 8/4/2020) (Dauterive, C). Modified on 8/4/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fieldwood Energy L L C and Island Operating Co Inc with Jury Demand filed by Toys O'Neil.(aty,David, Blake) Modified on 7/23/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fieldwood Energy L L C and Island Operating Co Inc. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fieldwood Energy L L C and Island Operating Co Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4329094) filed by Toys O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Blake Rossi David added to party Toys O'Neil(pty:pla))(aty,David, Blake) (Attachment 1 replaced with properly formatted pdf document on 7/22/2020) (Dauterive, C). Modified on 7/22/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 22, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil v. Fieldwood Energy L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy L L C
Represented By: James D Bercaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Operating Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toys O'Neil
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?