Veron v. Allergan U S A Inc
Plaintiff: Paige Veron
Defendant: Allergan U S A Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00932
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 21, directing transfer to District of New Jersey, In Re: Allergan Biocell Textured Breast Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2921. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 25, 2020 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by District of New Jersey on 8/25/2020, assigned case number 2:20-cv-11347. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-21) in MDL No.2921, IN RE: Allergan Biocell Textured Breast Implant Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the District of New Jersey upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Veron. Allergan U S A Inc served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (aty,Duck, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan U S A Inc. (crt,Taylor, L)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allergan U S A Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4332208) filed by Paige Veron. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Paige Veron(pty:pla))(aty,Duck, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Taylor, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veron v. Allergan U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Veron
Represented By: Kevin R Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?