Turbine Powered Technology L L C v. Crowe et al
Plaintiff: Turbine Powered Technology L L C
Defendant: George Jackson, Arizona Turbine Technology Inc, Kenneth Braccio, Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Daniel Foley, Donald I Foley, Jr, Turbine Integrated Power Systems L L C, Danny Foley, Kent Ellsworth, Arizona Turbine Technology L L C and George Anthony Jackson
3Rd Party Plaintiff: David Crowe
3Rd Party Defendant: Tucson Embedded Systems Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv00986
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit PR-1 Under Seal)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 10/2/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.4.1(W) Certificate, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 10/2/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT: Exhibit 1 by Advanced Turbine Services L L C re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(crt,Jones, P)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/29/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
September 25, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Attached Document Exhibits 2 - 4 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Advanced Turbine Services L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit 2 Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 Under Seal)(aty,Thornton, Jennifer)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Advanced Turbine Services L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(aty,Thornton, Jennifer)
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Kenneth Braccio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 3, 2017 Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - March 6, 2017 Transcript)(aty,Chaney, Christian) Modified docket text on 9/23/2020 (Bunting, M).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Advanced Turbine Services L L C and Kenneth Braccio shall file a brief limited to 40 pages excluding the table of contents and table of authorities in response to Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/10/2020. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 10/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Kenneth Braccio. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Chaney, Christian)
September 5, 2020 JUDGMENT filed in 16th JDC, St Mary Parish, LA, Case #130379 granting motion for summary judgment dismissing with prejudice the claim of David Crowe in Third-Party Petition against Tucson Embedded Systems signed on 7/30/18 in Franklin, LA. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #5 (pg 203) TO #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 5, 2020 JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT filed in 16th JDC, St Mary Parish, LA, Case #130379 granting Motion for Confirmation of Judgment and Motion for Default Judgment upon the court's order granting a preliminary injunction on 1/5/2017. Judgment of Default entered on all claims of plaintiff against Kent Ellsworth, in the amount of $30,239,469, plus legal interest and costs, signed on 4/24/2017 in Franklin, LA. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #2 (pg 93) TO #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER filed in 16th JDC, St Mary Parish, LA, Case #130379 granting Motion to Withdraw Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend; Adam G Young; John Alden Meade and Stephen Patrick Skiles as counsel for defendants, Donald I Foley Jr and George Jackson signed 3/20/19 in Franklin, LA. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #6 (pg 288) TO #17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER. (crt,Reeves, T) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (Reeves, T).
September 5, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Kenneth Braccio . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 3, #4 Exhibit A Part 4, #5 Exhibit A Part 5, #6 Exhibit A Part 6, #7 Exhibit A Part 7, #8 Exhibit A Part 8, #9 Exhibit A Part 9, #10 Exhibit A Part 10, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit B Part 2, #13 Exhibit B Part 3, #14 Exhibit C Part 1, #15 Exhibit C Part 2, #16 Exhibit C Part 3, #17 Exhibit D, #18 Exhibit E, #19 Exhibit F)(aty,Chaney, Christian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. (aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT: Exhibit P-6 by Turbine Powered Technology L L C re #9 Proposed MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/31/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. However, Plaintiff shall refile the proposed brief, limited to 30 pages, excluding the table of contents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/31/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Kevin P Merchant,Cliff A LaCour for Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/25/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal Attached Document re: #9 MOTION to Remand by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.4.1(W) Certificate, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit P-6 Under Seal)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 8/25/2020 to add document relation (Jones, P).
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: #9 MOTION to Remand by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.4.1(W) Certificate, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 8/25/2020 to add document relation (Jones, P).
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed Brief not allowed (see #16 Memorandum in Support), #3 Exhibit P-1, #4 Exhibit P-2, #5 Exhibit P-3, #6 Exhibit P-4, #7 Exhibit P-5)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 8/25/2020 to edit text and indicate proposed SEE #10 Motion for Leave (Jones, P). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 8/25/2020 (Jones, P). Modified description of attached brief as #10 order limited brief to only 30 pages on 9/9/2020 (Reeves, T).
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Kevin P. Merchant and Cliff A. LaCour to Enroll as Counsel by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.4.1 and 83.2.12 Certificate, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 8/21/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Consent to Removal by Ryan M Goudelocke on behalf of Donald I Foley, Jr, George Anthony Jackson, indicating Consent (Attorney Ryan M Goudelocke added to party Donald I Foley, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan M Goudelocke added to party George Anthony Jackson(pty:dft)) (aty,Goudelocke, Ryan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/6/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights with attachments. (Mailed out on 8/5/2020) (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition, #2 State Court Amended Petition, #3 State Court Second Amended Petition, #4 State Court Judgment, #5 Docket Sheet) (crt,Jones, P)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/5/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis) Modified on 8/5/2020to edit text (Jones, P).
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Turbine Services L L C identifying Corporate Parent Marine Propulsion Management L L C for Advanced Turbine Services L L C (Attorney Christian Stephen Durel Chaney added to party Advanced Turbine Services L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,Chaney, Christian)
August 4, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Arizona Turbine Technology Inc, Arizona Turbine Technology L L C, Kenneth Braccio, David Crowe, Kent Ellsworth, Turbine Integrated Power Systems L L C, Donald I Foley, Jr filed by Turbine Powered Technology L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #4 (pg 334) TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tucson Embedded Systems Inc filed by David Crowe. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #4 (pg 323) TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(Attorney Adam G Young added to party David Crowe(pty:dft), Attorney John Alden Meade added to party David Crowe(pty:dft))(crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 JUDGMENT dismissing George Jackson. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #4 (pg 185) TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Arizona Turbine Technology Inc, Arizona Turbine Technology L L C, Kenneth Braccio, David Crowe, Kent Ellsworth, Donald I Foley, Jr, Turbine Integrated Power Systems L L C, George Anthony Jackson filed by Turbine Powered Technology L L C, George Anthony Jackson. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #5 (pg 199) TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, by Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Arizona Turbine Technology Inc, Kenneth Braccio, David Crowe, Donald I Foley, Jr, George Anthony Jackson. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #8 (pg 205) TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(Attorney Stephen Patrick Skiles added to party Advanced Turbine Services L L C(pty:dft), Attorney John Alden Meade added to party Advanced Turbine Services L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Adam G Young added to party Advanced Turbine Services L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend added to party Advanced Turbine Services L L C(pty:dft), Attorney John Alden Meade added to party Arizona Turbine Technology Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Adam G Young added to party Arizona Turbine Technology Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend added to party Arizona Turbine Technology Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John Alden Meade added to party Kenneth Braccio(pty:dft), Attorney Adam G Young added to party Kenneth Braccio(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend added to party Kenneth Braccio(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend added to party David Crowe(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Patrick Skiles added to party Donald I Foley, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney John Alden Meade added to party Donald I Foley, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Adam G Young added to party Donald I Foley, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend added to party Donald I Foley, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Patrick Skiles added to party George Anthony Jackson(pty:dft), Attorney John Alden Meade added to party George Anthony Jackson(pty:dft), Attorney Adam G Young added to party George Anthony Jackson(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Taylor Townsend added to party George Anthony Jackson(pty:dft))(crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, by Tucson Embedded Systems Inc.ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #5 (pg 332) TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(Attorney Matthew James Fantaci added to party Tucson Embedded Systems Inc(pty:3pd), Attorney Haley Elizabeth Nix added to party Tucson Embedded Systems Inc(pty:3pd))(crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Mary Parish, Case Number 130379 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4346014) filed by Advanced Turbine Services L L C, Kenneth Braccio. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet w/ Ex. A, #2 Exhibit 1 (Transmittal Letters), #3 Exhibit 2 (Email Transmittal w/ Bkcy Order), #4 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 1), #5 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 2), #6 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 3), #7 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 4), #8 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 5), #9 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 6), #10 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 7), #11 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 8), #12 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 9), #13 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 10), #14 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 11), #15 Exhibit 3 (State Court Pleadings, pt. 12))(Attorney Jennifer L Thornton added to party Advanced Turbine Services L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Thornton, Jennifer) Modified on 8/5/2020 to add filer (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turbine Powered Technology L L C v. Crowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Turbine Technology Inc
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Braccio
Represented By: Jennifer L Thornton
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: William M Ross
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Represented By: Christian Stephen Durel Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Turbine Services L L C
Represented By: Jennifer L Thornton
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: William M Ross
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Represented By: Christian Stephen Durel Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald I Foley, Jr
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbine Integrated Power Systems L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Foley
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Turbine Technology L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Anthony Jackson
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turbine Powered Technology L L C
Represented By: Cliff A LaCour
Represented By: Diogenis C Panagiotis
Represented By: Kevin P Merchant
Represented By: Eric Isaiah Holden Hoggatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: David Crowe
Represented By: Adam G Young
Represented By: John Alden Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tucson Embedded Systems Inc
Represented By: Haley Elizabeth Nix
Represented By: Matthew James Fantaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?