Babin et al v. A Biz Action Insure Me Agency L L C et al
Plaintiff: Captain Lee Jr L L C and Lee Babin
Defendant: Salikha Berkovich, John Uhr, Columbia Casualty Co, A Biz Action Insurance Agency, United Specialty Insurance Co, A Biz Action Insure Me Agency, LLC, A Biz Action Insure Me Agency L L C and A-Biz Action Insurance Agency
Case Number: 6:2020cv00998
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corp, Corporate Parent State National Companies Inc for United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Elliott, Celeste)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Celeste D Elliott added to party United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 9/10/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Captain Lee Jr L L C. (aty,Gaidry, Edward)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Edward James Gaidry, Jr on behalf of Captain Lee Jr L L C. Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Edward James Gaidry, Jr on behalf of Captain Lee Jr L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/21/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A Biz Action Insure Me Agency L L C, A-Biz Action Insurance Agency, Salikha Berkovich, Columbia Casualty Co, John Uhr, United Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 6, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Biz Action Insure Me Agency L L C, A-Biz Action Insurance Agency, Salikha Berkovich, John Uhr, Columbia Casualty Co, United Specialty Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4348523) filed by Lee Babin, Captain Lee Jr L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed summons)(Attorney Edward James Gaidry, Jr added to party Lee Babin(pty:pla))(aty,Gaidry, Edward) Modified on 8/6/2020 to add filer and modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babin et al v. A Biz Action Insure Me Agency L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salikha Berkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Uhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Biz Action Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Celeste D Elliott
Represented By: David B Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Biz Action Insure Me Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Biz Action Insure Me Agency L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Biz Action Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain Lee Jr L L C
Represented By: Edward James Gaidry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Babin
Represented By: Edward James Gaidry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?