Technical Industries Inc et al v. S B International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Technical Industries Inc and Energy Technology Manufacturing & Threading L L C
Defendant: S B International Inc and Mudit Agarwal
Case Number: 6:2020cv01065
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, Alternatively, MOTION to Abstain or Stay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 11/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY: The Motion to Dismiss ECF No. #5 is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Whitehurst for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/6/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mudit Agarwal, S B International Inc identifying Corporate Parent S B Trading Co for S B International Inc. (aty,Ordeneaux, James) Modified to add corporate parent on 8/26/2020 (Thomas, T).
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, Alternatively, MOTION to Abstain or Stay. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified on 8/24/2020 (Thomas, T).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or, Alternatively, Motion to Abstain or Stay by Mudit Agarwal, S B International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - Texas Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Agarwal Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - Discovery Served in Texas Case)(aty,Ordeneaux, James). Added MOTION to Stay on 8/24/2020 (Thomas, T).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/18/2020. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 18, 2020 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Civil Case filing fee by Mudit Agarwal, S B International Inc. ( Filing Fee: $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4360512) . (aty,Assad, Mark)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark Thomas Assad on behalf of Mudit Agarwal, S B International Inc regarding #1 Notice (Other). Reason: No filing fee accompanied this Notice of Removal. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal by Mudit Agarwal, S B International Inc (Attorney Mark Thomas Assad added to party Mudit Agarwal(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Thomas Assad added to party S B International Inc (pty:dft)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Assad, Mark) Modified text and indicated deficient on 8/17/2020 (Dunford, T). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/18/2020 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technical Industries Inc et al v. S B International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S B International Inc
Represented By: Mark Thomas Assad
Represented By: James Keith Ordeneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mudit Agarwal
Represented By: Mark Thomas Assad
Represented By: James Keith Ordeneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technical Industries Inc
Represented By: Kaliste Joseph Saloom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Technology Manufacturing & Threading L L C
Represented By: Kaliste Joseph Saloom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?