Oil Mop L L C v. Chemical South Transport Inc et al
Plaintiff: Oil Mop LLC and Oil Mop L L C
Defendant: Chemical South Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Chemical South Transport Inc and Great West Casualty Co
Case Number: 6:2020cv01073
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, not later than November 9, 2020, Oil Mop shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts that support a finding that the parties are diverse in citizenship. These facts must be supported with summary-judgment-type evidence. The defendants shall cooperate with Oil Mop in gathering the necessary jurisdictional facts. The defendants will be allowed seven days to respond to Oil Mop's submission. Compliance Deadline set for 11/9/2020.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because the issue of subject-matter jurisdiction must be resolved before this Court can rule on Great Wests pending #7 Motion to Dismiss, the oral argument on that motion, which was previously scheduled for November 12, 2020, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/16/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Oil Mop L L C. (aty,Lee, Joseph)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great West Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic Insurance Group for Great West Casualty Co. (aty,Tatro, Nicholas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemical South Transport Inc. (aty,Tatro, Nicholas)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nicholas J Tatro for Chemical South Transport Inc and Great West Casualty Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/25/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Nicholas J. Tatro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4399559) by Chemical South Transport Inc, Great West Casualty Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Williams, Douglas)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Richard S Baron for Chemical South Transport Inc and Great West Casualty Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/23/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Richard S. Baron to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4395343) by Chemical South Transport Inc, Great West Casualty Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Williams, Douglas)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim sent to Douglas Kent Williams on behalf of Great West Casualty Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/6/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint sent to Douglas Kent Williams on behalf of Chemical South Transport Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/6/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 11/12/2002 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Great West Casualty Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A- GSA)(Attorney Douglas Kent Williams added to party Great West Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 9/22/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Chemical South Transport Inc.(Attorney Douglas Kent Williams added to party Chemical South Transport Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Douglas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oil Mop L L C. Great West Casualty Co served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (aty,Lee, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oil Mop L L C. (aty,Lee, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Joseph Edward Lee, III on behalf of Oil Mop L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/2/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chemical South Transport Inc and Great West Casualty Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 18, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chemical South Transport Inc and Great West Casualty Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4361473) filed by Oil Mop LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Joseph Edward Lee, III added to party Oil Mop L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Lee, Joseph) Modified on 8/19/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oil Mop L L C v. Chemical South Transport Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemical South Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemical South Transport Inc
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Mason
Represented By: Richard S Baron
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Nicholas J Tatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Co
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Mason
Represented By: Richard S Baron
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Nicholas J Tatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oil Mop LLC
Represented By: Joseph Edward Lee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oil Mop L L C
Represented By: Joseph Edward Lee, III
Represented By: Zachary Jules Ardoin
Represented By: Miles Paul Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?