In Re: B K M Marine L L C et al
Plaintiff: B K M Marine L L C
Not Classified By Court: Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv01092
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 CLAIM and ANSWER to Complaint by Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC.(Attorney Jessica Bankston Finley added to party Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC(pty:selreq))(aty,Finley, Jessica)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability re #7 Order on Motion. Claims due by 11/13/20. (crt,Reeves, T)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Approve Security, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/1/2020. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 24, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Motion to Approve Security, Initiate Limitation Concursus, and Issue Notice re #1 Complaint,, #3 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #5 Order on Motion for Extension . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Taylor, L)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Motion to Approve Security, Initiate Limitation Concursus, and Issue Notice re #1 Complaint,, #3 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #5 Order on Motion for Extension by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed Notice to Claimants)(aty,Tillery, Jefferson)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent. Compliance Deadline set for 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/21/2020. (crt,Taylor, L)
September 17, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Dunford, T)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Security with consent by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Tillery, Jefferson)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion or Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/25/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security by B K M Marine L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(crt,Dauterive, C)
August 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 20, 2020 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:20-cv-1092 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:20-cv-1092. (Wrong division selected at case opening) (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4364122) filed by B K M Marine L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Stipulation of Costs, #6 Ex Parte Motion, #7 Proposed order)(Attorney Jefferson R Tillery added to party BARGE MONCLA 102(pty:pet), Attorney Jefferson R Tillery added to party BKM MARINE, LLC(pty:pet))(aty,Tillery, Jefferson) Modified on 8/24/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: B K M Marine L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B K M Marine L L C
Represented By: Jefferson R Tillery
Represented By: Catherine Barrett Rice
Represented By: Sara Barry Kuebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Washburn Marine Shipyard, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?