Poirrier v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Eric Joseph Poirrier
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv01259
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Eric Joseph Poirrier. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/22/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Lemoine, Peter)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/25/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Joseph Poirrier. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lemoine, Peter)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Eric Joseph Poirrier. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Peter J Lemoine added to party Eric Joseph Poirrier(pty:pla))(aty,Lemoine, Peter)
September 24, 2020 Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst added. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poirrier v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Joseph Poirrier
Represented By: Peter J Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?