Broadhurst Estate et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: William C Broadhurst Estate and Nancy D Broadhurst
Defendant: U S DEPT of Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 6:2020cv01337
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6212
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the matter is DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 12/11/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER by Nancy D Broadhurst re #3 Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary. (aty,Privat, Kenneth) Modified on 12/10/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Nancy D Broadhurst, William C Broadhurst Estate, U S Dept of Internal Revenue Service. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/10/2020. (aty,Privat, Kenneth) Modified on 12/10/2020 to add filer (Jones, P). See #4 Proposed Order.
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Depart of Internal Revenue Service. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 15, 2020 Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Dept of Internal Revenue Service (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4425371) filed by William C Broadhurst Estate, Nancy D Broadhurst. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4)(Attorney Kenneth O Privat added to party Nancy D Broadhurst(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth O Privat added to party William C Broadhurst Estate(pty:pla))(aty,Privat, Kenneth) Modified docket text on 10/16/2020 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadhurst Estate et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Broadhurst Estate
Represented By: Kenneth O Privat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy D Broadhurst
Represented By: Kenneth O Privat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S DEPT of Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Conor P Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?