Wildcat Fluids L L C v. D E L Corp et al
Plaintiff: Wildcat Fluids L L C
Defendant: D E L Corp and Romac Environmental Services L L C
Case Number: 6:2020cv01672
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 09:30 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. SEE LEAD CASE - 20cv581 #28 (crt,Jordan, P)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER consolidating Lead Case 6:20-cv-0581 with cases 6:20-cv-0588 & 6:20-cv-1672. This order is filed as document #26 in lead case 6:20-cv-0581. Any Scheduling Orders previously issued in the pending matters are withdrawn and a new Scheduling Order will be issued for the consolidated matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
January 19, 2021 Cases associated. Create association to 6:20-cv-00581-RRS-CBW. (crt,Crick, S)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Stephen A Hebert for Romac Environmental Services L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/14/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Judge James D Cain, Jr, Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/13/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 13, 2021 Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER re: #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Romac Environmental Services L L C re #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (aty,Adams, Kent) Modified on 1/14/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
January 13, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for Stephen Hebert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4533845) by Romac Environmental Services L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Certificate of Good Standing TX State Bar, #2 Certificate of good standing Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court, #3 Proposed order Order)(aty,Adams, Kent)
January 6, 2021 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Romac Environmental Services L L C. (aty,Adams, Kent)
January 4, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by D E L Corp.(aty,Rauschenberger, Henry) Modified on 1/5/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TRANSFER ORDER regarding admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/4/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Henry Steven Rauschenberger to Enroll as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/4/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 29, 2020 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wildcat Fluids L L C (Attorney Douglas W Truxillo added to party Wildcat Fluids L L C(pty:pla)). (aty,Truxillo, Douglas)
December 28, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Henry Steven Rauschenberger to Enroll as Counsel by D E L Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rauschenberger, Henry)
December 28, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Deficiency to Henry Steven Rauschenberger on behalf of D E L Corp regarding #51 Notice of Appearance. Reason: A motion to enroll as co-counsel signed by the current counsel of record is required. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 28, 2020 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D E L Corp. (aty,Rauschenberger, Henry)
December 28, 2020 Filing 51 DEFICIENT NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Steven Rauschenberger on behalf of D E L Corp (Attorney Henry Steven Rauschenberger added to party D E L Corp(pty:dft)) (aty,Rauschenberger, Henry) Modified on 12/28/2020 to reflect deficient status (Dauterive, C). Modified on 12/29/2020 to reflect corrected and refiled as #54 Motion to Enroll as Counsel (Dauterive, C).
December 23, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Kent M Adams on behalf of Romac Environmental Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/6/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Michael K Leachman on behalf of D E L Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/6/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 23, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Terry Blaine Joseph on behalf of Wildcat Fluids L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/6/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 23, 2020 Filing 47 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/23/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 22, 2020 Motion Transferred regarding #30 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/22/2020.) (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 22, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 12/23/2020 to correct file date (Dauterive, C).
December 22, 2020 Filing 46 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00089. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE: denying as moot #7 Motion to Transfer Case ; denying as moot #11 Motion to Transfer Case ; granting #20 Second Motion to Transfer Case ; granting #21 Amended Motion to Transfer. All settings in this case are CANCELLED. (Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
December 21, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Louisiana, Lafayette Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 12/21/20, filed. (vrios, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #42 Notice (Other), #43 Notice (Other) , filed by Wildcat Fluids, LLC. (Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Additional Authority by Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Adams, Kent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY re: #20 Second MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Lafayette by DEL Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12-15-2020 Judgment in Louisiana Action)(Fackrell, Patrick) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 41 Amended JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed.(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Limited Stay.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 16, 2020 10/27/20 Hearing on Plaintiff Wildcat's preliminary injunction is terminated. (arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY in Support of #34 MOTION to Stay , filed by DEL Corporation. (Pringle, Lara) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition to #34 MOTION to Stay , filed by Wildcat Fluids, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEL Website 10/13/20, #2 Exhibit Romac Website 10/13/20, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Stay)(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Hebert on behalf of Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed. (Hebert, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 36 ADVISORY by Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed.(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 35 JOINDER in #34 MOTION to Stay , filed by Romac Environmental Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Adams, Kent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay by DEL Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pringle, Lara) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Video Teleconference re: D.E. #30 motion for preliminary injunction set for 10/27/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge David S Morales, filed. Zoom link can be found on the attached notice of setting. (arodriguez, 2)[Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Setting as to #30 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties notified. Oral Argument set for 10/27/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge David S Morales, filed. (arodriguez, 2) Zoom Link emailed to the parties on 9/29/20. [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 31 ADVISORY by Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Affidavit Brown, #19 Affidavit Hall, #20 Affidavit J. Weber, #21 Affidavit M. Weber, #22 Proposed Order Proposed Injunction)(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Additional Authority by Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Adams, Kent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE Of Supplemental Authority by DEL Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waddell, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY in Support of #20 Second MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Lafayette, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisisna, filed by DEL Corporation. (Pringle, Lara) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, filed by Wildcat Fluids, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER re: #24 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 Second MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Lafayette, filed by Wildcat Fluids, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Wildcat's Response)(Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Justin Pierce Quin terminated.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lara D. Pringle in place of Justin P. Quin by DEL Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pringle, Lara) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 Second MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Lafayette( Motion Docket Date 8/18/2020.) by DEL Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Quin, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S Morales Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 3/15/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2021. Demand Letter due by 11/30/2020 Mediation due by 6/30/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Status Conference set for 8/18/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge David S Morales Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/15/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2021. Objections due by 9/24/2021 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S Morales. Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held telephonically on 7/22/2020. Diversity verified. Discussion regarding venue and pending transfer motions. Parties request additional time on deadlines and trial date. The Court will allow additional time. Parties will file a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration. Appearances:Jorge Rangel, David Lodholz, Robert Waddell, Kent Adams.(Digital # 9:42 - 9:51)(ERO: Frances Carbia), filed.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed.(Adams, Kent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge C. Rangel on behalf of Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed. (Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lodholz on behalf of Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed. (Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed.(Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Wildcat Fluids, LLC.(Joseph, Terry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Michael Leachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Michael Leachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DEL Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2020. (Quin, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens, MOTION to Transfer Case to Louisiana( Motion Docket Date 7/31/2020.) by Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Waddell on behalf of DEL Corporation, filed. (Quin, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone (IPTC) Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge David S Morales, filed. (arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DEL Corporation, filed.(Quin, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisisna( Motion Docket Date 7/27/2020.) by DEL Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Declaration of Bob Kulbeth, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Ex. A - MLA, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Ex. A - Lafayette Action, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Complaint, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting DEL's MTD-MTV)(Quin, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wildcat Fluids, LLC, filed.(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Romac Environmental Services, LLC served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020, filed.(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
April 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Romac Environmental Services, LLC, filed.(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to DEL Corporation, filed.(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24542614) filed by Wildcat Fluids, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cordell, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildcat Fluids L L C v. D E L Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D E L Corp
Represented By: Robert L Waddell
Represented By: Michael K Leachman
Represented By: Henry Steven Rauschenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romac Environmental Services L L C
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Represented By: Stephen A Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildcat Fluids L L C
Represented By: Michael K Leachman
Represented By: Steven C Lanza
Represented By: Terry Blaine Joseph
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?