Boudreaux v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C et al
Plaintiff: Gaylen Boudreaux
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company, John Doe, Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2021cv00348
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Swift, Walmart, #2 Affidavit of Deputy Clerk, #3 State court petition, #4 Discovery by Boudreaux to Defendants, #5 State court citation, #6 State court return of service, #7 State court notice of filing Answer, #8 Jury Order)(aty,Swift, John)
February 25, 2021 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc. (16th JDC, Parish of St Martin, #91,016B, filed 1/27/2021) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #7 to Document #6, Response to Removal Order.(crt,Miletello, A)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Walmart Inc identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East L L C, W S E Management L L C, W S E Investment L L C for Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Walmart/Edwards)(aty,Swift, John) Modified on 2/19/2021 to add other affiliates (Jones, P).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/10/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/9/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John Goulding Swift on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/23/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St Martin Parish, Case Number 90016 B with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4567611) filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Goulding Swift added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft), Attorney John Goulding Swift added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Swift, John) Modified on 2/9/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
February 9, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylen Boudreaux
Represented By: Peyton Patrick Murphy
Represented By: James E Moore, Jr
Represented By: Renee H Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: John Goulding Swift
Represented By: Donna R Moliere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: John Goulding Swift
Represented By: Donna R Moliere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?