USA v. Citi Approved Enterprise L L C
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Citi Approved Enterprise L L C
Case Number: 6:2021cv00386
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Citi Approved Enterprise L L C waiver sent on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (aty,Anders, Jason)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citi Approved Enterprise L L C. (crt,Jones, P)
February 12, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jones, P)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA. (aty,Anders, Jason)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (letter size) filed by USA regarding #1 Complaint . (aty,Anders, Jason) Modified on 2/16/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citi Approved Enterprise L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4572850) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Bond, #2 Subcontract, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jason Ross Anders added to party USA(pty:pla))(aty,Anders, Jason) Modified on 2/16/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Citi Approved Enterprise L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Approved Enterprise L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Jason Ross Anders
Represented By: James Roy Washington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?