Mack Financial Services v. Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C
Plaintiff: Mack Financial Services
Defendant: Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C
Case Number: 6:2021cv00449
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to the Notice of Automatic Stay, Rec. Doc. 7 filed on April 9, 2021, the telephone scheduling conference with the Courtroom Deputy originally set for April 15, 2021 at 10:30 is hereby CANCELED. (crt,Guidry, C)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C by Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to add document number on 4/9/2021 (Bunting, M).
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on April 15, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 10:30 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to Writ of Sequestration by Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C re #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Draper, Douglas)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C.(Attorney Douglas S Draper added to party Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Draper, Douglas)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mack Financial Services. Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (aty,Callihan, Lawton)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4584399) filed by Mack Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Mack Financial Services(pty:pla))(aty,Callihan, Lawton)
February 24, 2021 Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna added. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack Financial Services v. Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Financial Services
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Crane & Construction L L C
Represented By: Douglas S Draper
Represented By: Michael Edward Landis
Represented By: Leslie A Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?