Boyett et al v. Arena Offshore L P et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Lynn Boyett and William David Boyett
Defendant: Island Operating Co Inc and Arena Offshore L P
Case Number: 6:2021cv00563
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William David Boyett, Stacy Lynn Boyett. Arena Offshore L P served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (aty,David, Blake)
April 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William David Boyett, Stacy Lynn Boyett. Island Operating Co Inc served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (aty,David, Blake)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arena Offshore L P, Island Operating Co Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 4, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arena Offshore L P, Island Operating Co Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4596783) filed by William David Boyett, Stacy Lynn Boyett. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Blake Rossi David added to party Stacy Lynn Boyett(pty:pla), Attorney Blake Rossi David added to party William David Boyett(pty:pla))(aty,David, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyett et al v. Arena Offshore L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Lynn Boyett
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Hebert
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William David Boyett
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Hebert
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Operating Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Offshore L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?