E P S Logistics Co et al v. Cox Operating L L C
Plaintiff: Expeditors & Production Services Co, E P S Logistics Co, E P S Logistics Co Inc and Expeditors & Production Services Co Inc
Defendant: Cox Operating L L C
Case Number: 6:2021cv01003
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cox Operating L L C.(aty,Landis, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Cox Operating L L C re #13 Order Requiring Submission on Jurisdictional Amount,,, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(aty,Landis, John)
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDING AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR SUIT ON OPEN ACCOUNT against Cox Operating L L C filed by E P S Logistics Co Inc, Expeditors & Production Services Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(crt,Alexander, E)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/20/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for Eastern District of Louisiana under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Defendant shall file a Reply in support of its Motion to Transfer Venue within seven (7) days of any order by this Court determining that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/20/2021. (crt,Alexander, E) Modified on 5/24/2021 to correct date filed. (Alexander, E)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for Eastern District of Louisiana under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) with consent sought but not yet obtained by Cox Operating L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Landis, John)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, not later than June 3, 2021, Cox shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts supporting a finding that the court has subject-matter jurisdiction. Any relevant facts must be supported with summary-judgment-type evidence. The plaintiffs will be allowed seven days to respond to Cox's submission. Compliance Deadline set for 6/3/2021.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument on Cox's pending #7 Motion to Transfer Venue, which was previously scheduled for June 10, 2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/13/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for Eastern District of Louisiana under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by E P S Logistics Co, Expeditors & Production Services Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Lafleur, Ward)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed EXHIBIT to Proposed Pleading re #10 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by E P S Logistics Co, Expeditors & Production Services Co. (aty,Lafleur, Ward) Modified on 5/14/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by E P S Logistics Co, Expeditors & Production Services Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Proposed pleading)(aty,Lafleur, Ward) Modified on 5/14/2021 to modify docket text and indicate #11 Proposed Exhibit to proposed pleading submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cox Operating L L C identifying Corporate Parent Phoenix Petro Services L L C for Cox Operating L L C. (aty,Landis, John)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for Eastern District of Louisiana under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Motion day set for 6/10/2021 9:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Taylor, L)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for Eastern District of Louisiana under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Cox Operating L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Landis, John)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/20/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cox Operating L L C answer due 5/13/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/20/2021. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/19/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John M Landis on behalf of Cox Operating L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/3/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Cox Operating L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Landis, John)
April 15, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Cox Operating L L C answer due 4/22/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 15, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20211556 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4642008) filed by Cox Operating L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John M Landis added to party Cox Operating L L C(pty:selreq))(aty,Landis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E P S Logistics Co et al v. Cox Operating L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Operating L L C
Represented By: John M Landis
Represented By: Edward B Poitevent, II
Represented By: Walter Frederick Metzinger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expeditors & Production Services Co
Represented By: Julie I Faulk
Represented By: Ward F Lafleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E P S Logistics Co
Represented By: Julie I Faulk
Represented By: Ward F Lafleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E P S Logistics Co Inc
Represented By: Julie I Faulk
Represented By: Ward F Lafleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expeditors & Production Services Co Inc
Represented By: Julie I Faulk
Represented By: Ward F Lafleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?