Guillory v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Ethel M. Guillory and Ethel M Guillory
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Indemnity Co
Special Master: Cade Richard Cole and Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Case Number: 6:2021cv01084
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Indemnity Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Co. (aty,Resor, Stephen)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allstate Indemnity Co.(Attorney Stephen Charles Resor added to party Allstate Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Resor, Stephen)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethel M Guillory. Allstate Indemnity Co served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (aty,Brasher, Derek)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Indemnity Co. (crt,Jones, P)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Jones, P) M
April 22, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Indemnity Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4650035) filed by Ethel M. Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Derek Clinton Brasher added to party Ethel M. Guillory(pty:pla))(aty,Brasher, Derek) Modified on 4/23/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillory v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Co
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: Stephannie M England
Represented By: Stephen Charles Resor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel M. Guillory
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel M Guillory
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?