G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C v. LaPapa Loca L L C et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC and G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C
Defendant: LaPapa Loca LLC, Cesar Barragan Rangel, Isabel Tomas Marin and LaPapa Loca L L C doing business as La Papa Loca
Case Number: 6:2021cv02610
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C. Isabel Tomas Marin served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (aty,Berthelot, Ronnie)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C. Cesar Barragan Rangel served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (aty,Berthelot, Ronnie)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C. LaPapa Loca L L C served on 9/12/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (aty,Berthelot, Ronnie)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LaPapa Loca L L C, Isabel Tomas Marin, Cesar Barragan Rangel. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C. (aty,Berthelot, Ronnie)
August 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (aty,Berthelot, Ronnie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4782057) filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ronnie J Berthelot added to party G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Berthelot, Ronnie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2021 blank civil cover) (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C v. LaPapa Loca L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Ronnie J Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events L L C
Represented By: Ronnie J Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaPapa Loca LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Barragan Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Tomas Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaPapa Loca L L C doing business as La Papa Loca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?