Fogleman-Laxey v. Guillory et al
Plaintiff: tara laxey-fogleman and Tara Fogleman-Laxey
Defendant: Josh Guillory, mayor-president of the city of lafayette, Scott Morgan, Mark Garber, Donald Landry, police officer does 1 through 10, Lafayette Consolidated Government, Police Officer Does, Joshua Guillory and Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government
Case Number: 6:2021cv03038
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively MOTION for More Definite Statement, #29 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 1/13/2022 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 9, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Joshua Guillory, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Scott Morgan. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Exhibit "B", #5 Exhibit "C")(aty,Rabalais, Joy) Modified docket text on 11/10/2021 (Miletello, A).
November 9, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mark Garber.(aty,Pate, James)
November 9, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively MOTION for More Definite Statement by Mark Garber. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents and Table of Authorities, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Attorney James L Pate added to party Mark Garber(pty:dft))(aty,Pate, James). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 11/10/2021 (Miletello, A).
November 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Donald Landry. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(aty,Rabalais, Joy) Modified docket text on 11/9/2021 (Miletello, A).
November 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages, #24 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 1/13/2022 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 9, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages by Joshua Guillory erroneously referred to as Josh Guillory, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government erroneously referred to as Lafayette Consolidated Government, Scott Morgan. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Joy C Rabalais added to party Josh Guillory(pty:dft), Lafayette Consolidated Government(pty:dft), Scott Morgan(pty:dft))(aty,Rabalais, Joy) Modified filer on 11/9/2021 (Miletello, A).
November 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Penalty, Punitive, or Exemplary Damages by Donald Landry. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Joy C Rabalais added to party Donald Landry(pty:dft))(aty,Rabalais, Joy)
October 15, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tara Fogleman-Laxey. Mark Garber waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (aty,Dworschak, Fabio)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4796563) filed by tara laxey-fogleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ, #5 Proposed summons/writ, #6 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Megan E Snider added to party tara laxey-fogleman(pty:pla))(aty,Snider, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogleman-Laxey v. Guillory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: tara laxey-fogleman
Represented By: Megan E Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Fogleman-Laxey
Represented By: Megan E Snider
Represented By: Fabio Dworschak
Represented By: James V O'Gara
Represented By: Malavika Abhay Rao
Represented By: Kaelyne Yumul Wietelman
Represented By: Maliha Khan
Represented By: Nancy K Archer-Yanochik
Represented By: Nora Sam Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Guillory
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mayor-president of the city of lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Morgan
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Jordan John Henagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Garber
Represented By: James L Pate
Represented By: Jennifer Miller Ardoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Landry
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Jordan John Henagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: police officer does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette Consolidated Government
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Guillory
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Jordan John Henagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Jordan John Henagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?