Rivera v. Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Solis Rivera
Defendant: Unknown, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security, I C E Field Office Director and Warden
Case Number: 6:2021cv03284
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Marco Antonio Solis Rivera, Pine Prairie ICE Processing Center, re: #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel returned marked: inmate not found. (crt,Haik, K)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/13/2021. (crt,Haik, K)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 10/18/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/16/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
September 13, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Devillier, W)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marco Antonio Solis Rivera. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Whitener, M)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marco Antonio Solis Rivera. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Whitener, M)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marco Antonio Solis Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Whitener, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Solis Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I C E Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?