Durio et al v. American Summit Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Troy Durio and Kristy Durio
Defendant: American Summit Insurance Co
Special Master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr and Cade Richard Cole
Case Number: 6:2021cv03314
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER - NOTICE of Compliance by American Summit Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Ex A)(aty,Leehy, Nicholas) Modified on 10/25/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Summit Insurance Co. (aty,Garrison, Travis)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/23/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/22/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Summit Insurance Co.(aty,Garrison, Travis)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Robert R Summerhays no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/22/2021. (crt,Whidden, C)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to reassign due to administrative error. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/20/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Jones, P)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER Referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Summit Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent ReAlign Insurance Holdings, Inc. for American Summit Insurance Co. (aty,Leehy, Nicholas)
September 15, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. American Summit Insurance Co answer due 9/22/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 15, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC Parish of St. Landry, Case Number 212688 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4819549) filed by American Summit Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Ex A, #4 Ex B, #5 Ex C, #6 Ex D)(Attorney Nicholas Scott Leehy added to party American Summit Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Leehy, Nicholas) Modified on 9/17/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
September 15, 2021 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 4:21-cv-3314 from Opelousas Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:21-cv-3314. (crt,Jones, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durio et al v. American Summit Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Durio
Represented By: Stephen Michael Huber
Represented By: Brian James Houghtaling
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Logan Schonekas Albertine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Durio
Represented By: Stephen Michael Huber
Represented By: Brian James Houghtaling
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Logan Schonekas Albertine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Summit Insurance Co
Represented By: Travis L Garrison
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Leehy
Represented By: Lyon H Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By: Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Cade Richard Cole
Represented By: Cade Richard Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?