Lee v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Lee
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Parcel Services Inc, John Doe and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2021cv03805
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on January 6, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 03:00 PM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, United Parcel Services Inc.(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holdings Co, Corporate Parent L M H C Massachusetts Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc, for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, United Parcel Services Inc. (aty,O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified to add corporate parents and filer on 11/15/2021 (Thomas, T).
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, United Parcel Services Inc re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified to more accurately reflect document filed on 11/4/2021 (Thomas, T).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/2/2021. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/1/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jennifer Ann O'Connell on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Parcel Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 28, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC, Iberia Parish, Case Number 138124 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4875814) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, United Parcel Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Jennifer Ann O'Connell added to party Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ann O'Connell added to party United Parcel Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,O'Connell, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Lee
Represented By: Lawrence B Jones
Represented By: Patrick J Eskew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Services Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Represented By: Marvin H Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Jennifer Ann O'Connell
Represented By: Marvin H Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?