Bush v. Safeway Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Travis Bush
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Co, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Ruperto Vega Conde and Yoni Medina
Case Number: 6:2021cv03811
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 27th Judicial District Court for St. Landry Parish. (crt,Crick, S)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 11/18/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 16, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Brian L Coody on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co regarding #8 Motion to Remand. Action taken: Terminated #8 Motion to Remand. #9 Corrected Motion to Remand submitted. (crt,Crick, S)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 Voluntary Motion to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Coody, Brian) Modified on 11/17/2021 to capture motion event. (Crick, S).
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 Voluntary MOTION to Remand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Coody, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2021 to capture motion event modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR. PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Coody, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2021 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
November 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 Motion to Remand. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 12, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Brian L Coody on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co regarding #6 MOTION to Remand , #7 Proposed Order/Judgment. Action taken: Terminated #6 & #7 Motions to Remand filed in error. #8 Motion to Remand resubmitted. (crt,Crick, S)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR. MOTION to Remand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/12/2021. (aty,Coody, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2021 to indicate #8 Motion to Remand with proposed order submitted. (Crick, S).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/2/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint, sent to Byron A Richie on behalf of Safeway Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/1/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 28, 2021 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 2:21-cv-3811 from Lake Charles Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:21-cv-3811. Case assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 28, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeway Insurance Co. (filed in 27th JDC, St Landry Parish on 10/18/2021)(Attorney Byron A Richie added to party Safeway Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney C Vernon Richie added to party Safeway Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Oberle, Jr added to party Safeway Insurance Co(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (aty,Coody, Brian)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 2021-3472 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4875910) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition, #3 Proposed pleading State Farm's Answer not yet scanned in 27th JDC)(Attorney Brian L Coody added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Coody, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Safeway Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Travis Bush
Represented By: Pride J Doran
Represented By: Corrie Ruth Gallien
Represented By: Quincy L Cawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Co
Represented By: Byron A Richie
Represented By: C Vernon Richie
Represented By: Paul D Oberle, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: Brian L Coody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruperto Vega Conde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoni Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?