Rountree et al v. Street et al
Plaintiff: Damion Rountree and Clifford Scott
Defendant: Curtis N Street, Werner Enterprises Inc and Ace American Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2021cv03936
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER The Court ORDERS that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #7 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. The Court further ORDERS that the hearing for this Motion, which is currently set for January 27, 2022, is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 12/8/2021. (crt,Guidry, C)
November 29, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Damion Rountree, Clifford Scott re #14 Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary. (aty,Nims, Tucker)
November 29, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Werner Enterprises Inc by Damion Rountree, Clifford Scott. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/29/2021. (aty,Nims, Tucker) Modified on 11/29/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims of plaintiffs, Damion Rountree and Clifford Scott, against defendant, Werner Enterprises, Inc. for negligent hiring, training, supervision, entrustment, and retention, as asserted in Paragraph 10 of their Complaint, be DISMISSED without prejudice specifically reserving all rights of plaintiffs, Damion Rountree and Clifford Scott, to proceed against defendants, Curtis Street and Werner Enterprises, Inc. for any and all remaining claims. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 11/24/2021. (crt,Guidry, C)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 11/24/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss (by plaintiffs, Damion Rountree and Clifford Scott) by Ace American Insurance Co, Curtis N Street, Werner Enterprises Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Aucoin, Ralph)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. Motion day set for 1/27/2022 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Jones, P)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Table of Contents and Table of Cases, Statutes and Authorities filed by Ace American Insurance Co, Curtis N Street, Werner Enterprises Inc regarding #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (aty,Aucoin, Ralph)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/16/2021. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency to Ralph J Aucoin, Jr on behalf of Ace American Insurance Co, Curtis N Street, Werner Enterprises Inc regarding #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,Jones, P)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Ace American Insurance Co, Curtis N Street, Werner Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Statement of material facts, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Aucoin, Ralph) Modified on 11/16/2021 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 11/17/2021 to remove deficiency and indicate SEE #10 Table of Contents and Authorities (Jones, P).
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent I N A Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent I N A Financial Corp, Corporate Parent I N A Corp, Corporate Parent Chubb I N A Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd for Ace American Insurance Co. (aty,Aucoin, Ralph) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Werner Enterprises Inc. (aty,Aucoin, Ralph)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Guy D Perrier, Kristopher Michael Gould, Ralph J Aucoin, Jr on behalf of Ace American Insurance Co, Werner Enterprises Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Co, Curtis N Street, Werner Enterprises Inc.(aty,Aucoin, Ralph)
November 11, 2021 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:21-cv-3936 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:21-cv-3936. (crt,Jones, P)
November 11, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jones, P)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC, Lafayette Parish, Case Number 20215539 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4891841) filed by Werner Enterprises Inc, Curtis N Street, Ace American Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A-Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit B-Stipulation, #6 Exhibit C-MRIs, #7 Exhibit D-Dr. Trahan surgery recomm., #8 Exhibit E-past medicals, #9 Exhibit F-future medicals, #10 List of Parties, #11 List of Pleadings, #12 State court petition Exhibit 1, #13 State court citation Exhibit 2)(Attorney Ralph J Aucoin, Jr added to party Ace American Insurance Co, Curtis N. Street, Werner Enterprises Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Aucoin, Ralph) Modified on 11/15/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rountree et al v. Street et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Rountree
Represented By: Tucker Wagner Nims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Scott
Represented By: Tucker Wagner Nims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis N Street
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Kristopher Michael Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Kristopher Michael Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Kristopher Michael Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?