Bernard et al v. Trujillo et al
Plaintiff: bobby bernard and Thomas bernard
Defendant: Martin trujillo, Jr., Juan Macias, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, Martin Trujillo, Jr and G E I C O County Mutual Insurance Co
Petitioner: City Police of Lafayette
Case Number: 6:2021cv04090
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER re #5 Motion for Protective Order, Motion for In Camera Inspection. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. LPD is not required to produce or disclose the materials requested in the subpoena propounded by GEICO, and that subpoena is hereby QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/27/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 17, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Martin Trujillo, Jr.(aty,Cronin, Stephen)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Protective Order andUnopposed MOTION for In Camera Inspection filed by City Police of Lafayette. (aty,Ardoin, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by City Police of Lafayette re #5 Motion for Protective Order,, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (aty,Ardoin, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER The subpoena served on the Lafayette Police Department ("LPD") by GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, which seeks documents related to a criminal matter pending in Lafayette City Court, and which requests production of those documents on January 4, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the Motion for In Camera Inspection and for Protective Order [Doc. 5] filed by the LPD. GEICO shall file a response to the pending motion on or before January 7, 2022. Upon the filing of the response, the matter will be deemed under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/29/2021. (crt,Blanke, S)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Protective Order andUnopposed MOTION for In Camera Inspection filed by G E I C O County Mutual Insurance Co, Juan Macias, Martin Trujillo, Jr. (aty,Cronin, Stephen)
December 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Protective Order andUnopposed MOTION for In Camera Inspection. Responses due by 1/7/2022 (crt,Chicola, C)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order and, Unopposed MOTION for In Camera Inspection (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/28/2021.) by City Police of Lafayette. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Unopposed Motion for In Camera Inspection and Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney Jennifer Miller Ardoin added to party City Police of Lafayette(pty:mov))(aty,Ardoin, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/2/2021. (crt,Chicola, C)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Martin Trujillo, Jr. (aty,Cronin, Stephen) (Main Document 2 replaced with non-fillable form on 12/1/2021) (Crick, S).
November 30, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Martin Trujillo, Jr answer due 12/7/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
November 30, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC/ Lafayette Parish, Case Number 20214835 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4910440) filed by Martin trujillo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit Proof of Long Arm Service, #4 Exhibit Bobby Bernard - Settlement Demand, #5 Exhibit Thomas Bernard - Settlement Demand)(Attorney Stephen Dale Cronin added to party Martin trujillo, Jr(pty:dft))(aty,Cronin, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard et al v. Trujillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: bobby bernard
Represented By: Jacob Houston Hargett
Represented By: Jason M Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas bernard
Represented By: Jacob Houston Hargett
Represented By: Jason M Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin trujillo, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Dale Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Trujillo, Jr
Represented By: Stephen Dale Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E I C O County Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City Police of Lafayette
Represented By: Jennifer Miller Ardoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?