David v. National Interstate Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Crystal David
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C and Jamie Vasquez
Case Number: 6:2021cv04453
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna filed by National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(aty,Price, Eric)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/5/2022. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C.(aty,Price, Eric)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency to Eric R Price on behalf of National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C regarding #4 Answer to Complaint. Reason: The document is not on letter-size paper as required by LR10.1. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C identifying Corporate Parent Spirit Truck Lines, LLC for Spirit Truck Lines L L C; Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for National Interstate Insurance Co. (aty,Price, Eric)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 DEFICIENT? ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C.(aty,Price, Eric) Modified on 1/3/2022 to indicate deficient (Miletello, A).
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/3/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Eric R Price on behalf of National Interstate Insurance Co, Spirit Truck Lines L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 30, 2021 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:21-CV-4453 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:21-CV-4453. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 30, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. National Interstate Insurance Co answer due 1/6/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 30, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC of St. Martin Parish, Case Number 091175 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4943957) filed by Spirit Truck Lines, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 List of Parties, #4 List of Pleadings, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Certificate of Filing)(Attorney Eric R Price added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Eric R Price added to party Spirit Truck Lines, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Price, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. National Interstate Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal David
Represented By: Jerome Harold Moroux
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Eric R Price
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Truck Lines L L C
Represented By: Eric R Price
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?