Gardiner v. U S A
Plaintiff: Shawne Gielen Gardiner
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 6:2022cv00591
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Internal Revenue Service. (crt,Crick, S)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA with Jury Demand filed by Shawne Gielen Gardiner.(aty,Maurer, Lauren)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/1/2022.)(crt,Roaix, G)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Internal Revenue Service. (crt,Crick, S)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5015674) filed by Shawne Gielen Gardiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Lauren Noel Maurer added to party Shawne Gielen Gardiner(pty:selreq))(aty,Maurer, Lauren) Modified on 3/3/2022 to modify docket text.(Crick, S).
March 2, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardiner v. U S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawne Gielen Gardiner
Represented By: Lauren Noel Maurer
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?