Vera Revelo v. Caizalez Cedeo
Plaintiff: Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo
Defendant: Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno
Respondent: Griseld Andrea Caizalez Cedeo
Case Number: 6:2022cv01419
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 22 U.S.C. ยง 9001 International Child Abduction Remedies
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the deadline for the parties to submit their respective Statements of Law be and is hereby extended to 7/25/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the deadline for the parties to exchange their Witness and Exhibit Lists is hereby extended to 7/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/21/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
July 20, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Witness and Exhibit Lists and Submit Statements of Law with consent by Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Extension of Time)(aty,Renegar, Dona)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicolette S Kraska terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/18/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
July 15, 2022 Filing 28 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw Nicolette S. Kraska as Attorney by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Kraska, Nicolette)
July 14, 2022 Filing 27 Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno's ANSWER to Complaint Verified Petition for Return of Child to Petitioner by Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno.(aty,Renegar, Dona)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel G. Andrew Veazey and Rebecca K. Bayless for Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/1/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 30, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for G. Andrew Veazey and Rebecca K. Bayless to Enroll as Counsel by Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney George Andrew Veazey added to party Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno(pty:dft))(aty,Veazey, George) Modified on 6/30/2022 (Thomas, T).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondent, Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno's deadline to file Answer/Responsive Pleadings is extended to 7/14/2022. Granting #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Witness & Exhibit Lists and Statement of Law. Exhibit and Witness Lists and Statement of Law is extended to 7/20/2022. Granting #23 Motion to Continue Hearing on the merits currently scheduled for July 12, 2022 is continued. A Video Status Conference is set for 7/22/2022 at 10:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Judge David C Joseph to establish a new court date. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/29/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 29, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Extension of Time)(aty,Renegar, Dona). Added MOTION for Extension of Exchanging Witness & Exhibit Lists Deadline, MOTION to Continue Hearing, MOTION for Telephone Status Conference on 6/29/2022 (Thomas, T).
June 29, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOTION for Extension of Exchanging Witness & Exhibit Lists Deadline MOTION to Continue Hearing MOTION for Telephone Status Conference. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Appointing Attorney: The Court hereby APPOINTS Dona K. Renegar and the law firm of Veazey Felder & Renegar, LLC as counsel for Respondent, Griseld Andrea Caizalez Cedeo. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/27/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 23, 2022 Filing 21 DUPLICATE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RULING AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #9 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. The Court grants Petitioners Motion and herein issues a Preliminary Injunction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. This Preliminary Injunction shall remain in effect until the Court's final resolution of this matter on the merits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED:Within ten (10) days of this Order, the United States Department of Homeland Security and the United States Department of State are directed to produce to the undersigned any and all documents related to the immigration status, pending immigration proceedings, and immigration history including A Files and prior removals, if any of both Caizalez Cedeo and her minor child, P.A.V.C.The Department of Homeland Security is further ordered not to remove Caizalez Cedeo or her minor child, P.A.V.C., from the Western District of Louisiana without leave of Court during the pendency of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service of this Ruling and Preliminary Injunction is made on the United States Attorney for this District on behalf of the Department of Homeland Security and Department of State. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on the merits of Vera Revelos Verified Complaint [Doc. 1] shall be held on July 12, 2022, at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/14/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 14, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge David C Joseph. MOTION HEARING held on 6/14/2022 re #9 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing, and Verified Complaint #1 filed by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. The Court will issue a Preliminary Injunction ruling today. The unopposed Preliminary Injunction requires Ms. Caizalez Cedeo not to leave the Western District of Louisiana and requires her to comply with the pre-established agreement for communication between the minor child and Petitioner, Mr. Vera Revelo, which mandates communication at least twice a week for a reasonable time period. It also requires her to surrender the minor child's passport and related travel documents to the Court should they be returned to her possession. The Court ordered the trial on the merits set for 7/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge David C Joseph. The Court ordered Witness and Exhibit List due by 7/5/2022. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions including the status conferred to Petitioner under Ecuadorian law as a non-custodial parent with visitation rights on or before 7/5/2022. Copy of Minutes forwarded via email to Respondent, Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno. (Court Reporter: Cathleen E Marquardt) (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 14, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS/Temporary Restraining Order Returned Executed by the U S Marshal. Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return Page 2)(crt,LaCombe, L)
June 14, 2022 NOTICE: Certified Copy of #20 Memorandum Ruling and Preliminary Injunction forwarded via email to United States Attorney for the WD/LA Brandon Brown, AUSA Shannon Brown, AUSA Jerry Edwards. Certified Copy of #20 Memorandum Ruling and Preliminary Injunction as well as #19 Minutes forwarded to Respondent, Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno by CRD on 6/14/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 13, 2022 Filing 16 EXHIBIT LIST & WITNESS LIST by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. (aty,Poucher, Stephanie)
June 8, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge David C Joseph. A Telephone Status Conference was held 6/8/2022. Counsel for Plaintiff indicated that service of the Complaint, Ruling, and Temporary Restraining Order has not been executed on Respondent/Defendant after numerous attempts by the Special Process Server or the U S Marshal. The Court informed Counsel that if service of the documents were not executed, the hearing currently set for June 14, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. would be reset. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Petitioner's Motion to Appear via Video Conference. Petitioner Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo will appear via Video Conference at the hearing on the merits of Petitioner's Verified Petition. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/8/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 7, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY: A Telephone Status Conference is set for 6/8/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge David C Joseph. Counsel shall call the AT&T conference number at 877-402-9757. When prompted for an access code enter 3957834. Only counsel of record may participate in the conference. Issued by Judge David C Joseph on 6/7/2022. (crt,Taylor, L)
June 7, 2022 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION to Appear for Hearing Via Video Conference re #10 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Serve, by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith-Clevenger, Sarah) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 6/7/2022 (Bunting, M).
June 7, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on the merits of Petitioners Verified Complaint (Doc. #1 ) be held on June 14, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 at the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana in Lafayette, Louisiana. Respondent shall attend the hearing with her minor child. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that P.A.V.C., the minor child shall not be removed from the Western District of Louisiana by Respondent, or any person acting in concert or participating with Respondent, pending the hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this temporary restraining order will expire on 6/14/2022 at 5:00 p.m. CDT, unless extended. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 9:00 AM by phone before Judge David C Joseph. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/3/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULING granting #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing and MOTION for Service by USM. The U S Marshal's Service shall service Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno with a copy of Petitioner's #9 Application for TRO and Motion for an Expedited Evidentiary hearing, as well as copy of this Ruling and accompanying TRO. All costs associated with service of these documents shall be paid by Vera Revelo. Hearing on #1 Verified Complaint set for 6/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge David C Joseph. This Ruling does not prevent the parties from moving the Court for a continuance of this hearing for good cause. No security bond will be required for the issuance of this temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/3/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing and MOTION for Service by USM by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Certification, #3 Proposed Order)(aty,Kraska, Nicolette). Added MOTION for Hearing, MOTION to Serve by USM on 6/3/2022 (Reeves, T).
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT: SEALED EXHIBIT A by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit B, #2 Sealed Exhibit C, #3 Sealed Exhibit D, #4 Sealed Exhibit E, #5 Sealed Exhibit F, #6 Sealed Exhibit G)(crt,Taylor, L)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Issued by Judge David C Joseph on 6/2/2022. (crt,Taylor, L)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Attached Document Unredacted Exhibits to Verified Petition by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed order)(aty,Smith-Clevenger, Sarah)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER MOOTING #4 Motion for Issuance of Order Pursuant to 22 U.S.C. Section 9004 by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. On May 31, 2022, counsel was advised by the Courtroom Deputy that the Court would only consider the relief requested under the standard set forth in FRCP 65. Counsel indicated that they would file a motion for injunctive relief as set forth in FRCP 65. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 6/2/2022. (crt,LaCombe, L)
May 27, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Issuance of Order Pursuant to 22 U.S.C. Section 9004. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Issuance of Order Pursuant to 22 U.S.C. Section 9004 by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Kraska, Nicolette)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno to reflect correction to defendant last name. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Griseld Andrea Caizalez Cedeo. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 26, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Griseld Andrea Caizalez Cedeo (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5120087) filed by Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A- Hague Convention, #4 Exhibit B- Birth Certificate, #5 Exhibit C- Custody Agreement, #6 Exhibit D- Travel Auth., #7 Exhibit E- Hague App., #8 Exhibit F- State Dept. Letter, #9 Exhibit G- Translated Code)(Attorney Nicolette S Kraska added to party Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo(pty:pet))(aty,Kraska, Nicolette) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/27/2022) (Chavis, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera Revelo v. Caizalez Cedeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Sebastian Vera Revelo
Represented By: Nicolette S Kraska
Represented By: Christopher K Ralston
Represented By: Sarah M Smith-Clevenger
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Poucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Griseld Andrea Caizalez Cedeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griseld Andrea Canizalez Cedeno
Represented By: Dona Kay Renegar
Represented By: George Andrew Veazey
Represented By: Rebecca Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?