D A C O Investments L L C et al v. U S Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: DACO Investments, LLC d/b/a OUPAC Financial Services, American Financial Services Association, Westside Credit Corporation, Inc., Motorists Acceptance Corporation d/b/a Saddleback Acceptance Corporation, Challenge Financial Services, Eagle Financial Services, Inc., Sunrise Finance Company, Moore Finance Company Inc., Vehicle Acceptance Corporation, D A C O Investments L L C doing business as Oupac Financial Services, Westside Credit Corp Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp doing business as Saddleback Acceptance Corp, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Sunrise Finance Co, Moore Finance Co Inc and Vehicle Acceptance Corp
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration, Isabella Casillas Guzman, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Small Business Administration, Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as United States Secretary of Treasury, The United States of America, U S Small Business Administration, Isabella Casillas Guzman, Janet Yellen and USA
Case Number: 6:2022cv01444
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eagle Financial Services Inc, Westside Credit Corp Inc, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, American Financial Services Association, Moore Finance Co Inc, D A C O Investments L L C, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Challenge Financial Services. Isabella Casillas Guzman served on 6/6/2022, answer due 8/5/2022; U S Small Business Administration served on served on 6/6/2022, answer due 8/5/2022; USA served on served on 6/6/2022, answer due 8/5/2022; Janet Yellen served on served on 6/6/2022, answer due 8/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E Return Receipts and Tracking)(aty,St John, Anna) Modified on 7/6/2022 to reflect date of service and answer due date. (Alexander, E)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, (aty,St John, Anna)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc identifying Corporate Parent Link Holding LLC for D A C O Investments L L C. (aty,St John, Anna)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kevin M LeRoy for American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/2/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Emily A O'Brien for American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/2/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jeremy Rosenblum for American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co,Jeremy Rosenblum, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/2/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Misha Tseytlin for American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/2/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #2 MOTION for Misha Tseytlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5121819) by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. (aty,St John, Anna)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Small Business Administration, Isabella Casillas Guzman, Janet Yellen, USA. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 27, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Kevin M. LeRoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5121865) by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Anna) Modified docket text on 5/31/2022 (Miletello, A).
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Emily A. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5121860) by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Anna) Modified docket text on 5/31/2022 (Miletello, A).
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Jeremy Rosenblum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5121844) by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Anna) Modified docket text on 5/31/2022 (Miletello, A).
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Misha Tseytlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5121819) by American Financial Services Association, Challenge Financial Services, D A C O Investments L L C, Eagle Financial Services Inc, Moore Finance Co Inc, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, Westside Credit Corp Inc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Corrected at Doc #7 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St John, Anna) Modified docket text on 5/31/2022 (Miletello, A). Modified on 6/1/2022 to indicate corrected certificate submitted at doc #7 (Miletello, A).
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Isabella Casillas Guzman, Janet Yellen, USA, U S Small Business Administration (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5121728) filed by Eagle Financial Services Inc, Westside Credit Corp Inc, Sunrise Finance Co, Vehicle Acceptance Corp, American Financial Services Association, Moore Finance Co Inc, D A C O Investments L L C, Motorists Acceptance Corp, Challenge Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Anna St John added to party American Financial Services Association(pty:pla), Challenge Financial Services(pty:pla), D A C O Investments L L C(pty:pla), Eagle Financial Services Inc(pty:pla), Moore Finance Co Inc(pty:pla), Motorists Acceptance Corp(pty:pla), Sunrise Finance Co(pty:pla), Vehicle Acceptance Corp(pty:pla), Westside Credit Corp Inc(pty:pla))(aty,St John, Anna) Modified docket text on 5/31/2022 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D A C O Investments L L C et al v. U S Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DACO Investments, LLC d/b/a OUPAC Financial Services
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Financial Services Association
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westside Credit Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorists Acceptance Corporation d/b/a Saddleback Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Challenge Financial Services
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunrise Finance Company
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moore Finance Company Inc.
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vehicle Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Anna St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D A C O Investments L L C doing business as Oupac Financial Services
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westside Credit Corp Inc
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorists Acceptance Corp doing business as Saddleback Acceptance Corp
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Financial Services Inc
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunrise Finance Co
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moore Finance Co Inc
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vehicle Acceptance Corp
Represented By: Anna St John
Represented By: Emily A O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremy Rosenblum
Represented By: Kevin M LeRoy
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Casillas Guzman, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as United States Secretary of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Casillas Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?