Smith Maritime Inc v. McConville
Plaintiff: Smith Maritime Inc
Defendant: Casey McConville
Case Number: 6:2022cv05273
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smith Maritime Inc. Casey McConville waiver sent on 9/19/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. (aty,Smith, Phillip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Maritime Inc. (aty,Smith, Phillip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Phillip Michael Smith on behalf of Smith Maritime Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/19/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Casey McConville. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 19, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Casey McConville (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5281188) filed by Smith Maritime Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Phillip Michael Smith added to party Smith Maritime Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Smith, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Maritime Inc v. McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Maritime Inc
Represented By: Phillip Michael Smith
Represented By: Francis X Neuner, Jr
Represented By: Jed Michel Mestayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?