McGee v. Potier et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Frank McGee
Defendant: Kevin Potier, Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc and Mayflower Transit L L C
Case Number: 6:2022cv05963
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc, Kevin Potier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,Hands, Iliaura) Modified docket text to more accurately describe document filed on 12/29/2022 (Bunting, M).
December 16, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aaron Frank McGee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Robinson, Michael)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 12/15/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED #16 Motion to Intervene is granted, as there is no opposition to such. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 12/13/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
December 12, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Dismissal of Counts 1-5 Without Prejudice by Aaron Frank McGee. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/12/2022. (aty,Robinson, Michael) Modified to correct docket entry relationship on 12/12/2022 (Thomas, T).
December 7, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents Transportation Services Group Inc and UniGroup C A for Mayflower Transit L L C by Mayflower Transit L L C. (aty,Hands, Iliaura) Modified to add corporate parents on 12/7/2022 (Thomas, T).
December 7, 2022 Filing 17 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #11 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Iliaura Hands on behalf of Mayflower Transit L L C. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
December 2, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene with consent sought but not yet obtained by Mayflower Transit L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Hands, Iliaura) Modified on 12/2/2022 (Thomas, T).
November 30, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc. (aty,Hands, Iliaura)
November 30, 2022 Filing 14 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Iliaura Hands on behalf of Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin Potier, American Transfer & Storage Inc, Acadiana Movers L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Issued by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 11/22/2022. (crt,Taylor, L)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion to Intervene,, sent to Iliaura Hands on behalf of Mayflower Transit L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency to Iliaura Hands on behalf of Mayflower Transit L L C regarding #8 MOTION to Intervene with consent sought but not yet obtained . Reason: A motion for leave to file must be accompanied by the proposed pleading. The court will not act on such a motion without reviewing the document sought to be filed. Please refer to LR 7.6 for more information. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Intervene with consent sought but not yet obtained filed by Mayflower Transit. (aty,Hands, Iliaura)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 DEFICIENT MOTION to Intervene with consent sought but not yet obtained by Mayflower Transit L L C. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Iliaura Hands added to party Mayflower Transit(pty:selreq))(aty,Hands, Iliaura) Modified to reflect deficiency on 11/22/2022 (Thomas, T). Modified to indicate document corrected and resubmitted on 12/2/2022 (Thomas, T).
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Dismissal of Counts 1-5 Without Prejudice filed by Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc, Kevin Potier. (aty,Hands, Iliaura)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Dismissal of Counts 1-5 Without Prejudice by Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc, Kevin Potier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hands, Iliaura) Modified to correct event type on 11/21/2022 (Thomas, T).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 11/17/2022. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/15/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Iliaura Hands on behalf of Acadiana Movers L L C, American Transfer & Storage Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 14, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from St. Landry, Case Number 331832 (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by American Transfer & Storage Inc, Acadiana Movers L L C, Kevin Potier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State court notice of filing, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Iliaura Hands added to party Acadiana Movers L L C(pty:selreq), Attorney Iliaura Hands added to party American Transfer & Storage Inc.(pty:selreq), Attorney Iliaura Hands added to party Kevin Potier(pty:selreq))(aty,Hands, Iliaura) (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/15/2022) (Bunting, M). Modified docket text on 11/15/2022 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Potier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Frank McGee
Represented By: Michael W Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Potier
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadiana Movers L L C
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Transfer & Storage Inc
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayflower Transit L L C
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?