Gallow et al v. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C et al
Plaintiff: Darryl D Gallow and Darbara Gallow
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Inc, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc and Bridgestone Americas Inc
Case Number: 6:2023cv00007
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David C Joseph
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2023 02:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER A Scheduling Conference is set for March 16, 2023 at 2:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26(f) report into the record on or before March 13, 2023. During the teleconference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Court's consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The parties will join the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1839 and entering access code 2869540.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/1/2023. (crt,Blanke, S)
February 15, 2023 Filing 19 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. (aty,McMannen, Christy)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of R Todd Marshall for Bridgestone Americas Inc,R Todd Marshall for Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C,R Todd Marshall for Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc,R Todd Marshall for Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/10/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 9, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for R. Todd Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5454519) by Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,McMannen, Christy)
February 7, 2023 Filing 16 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darbara Gallow, Darryl D Gallow. (aty,Popilock, John)
February 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance with Removal Order by Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C re #4 Removal Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(aty,McMannen, Christy)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, sent to Misti Landry Bryant on behalf of Darbara Gallow, Darryl D Gallow. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/15/2023. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christy L McMannen on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/15/2023. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of T Christopher Trent for Bridgestone Americas Inc,T Christopher Trent for Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C,T Christopher Trent for Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc,T Christopher Trent for Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/30/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for T. Christopher Trent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5439408) by Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oklahoma State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit USDC Southern District of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Texas State Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,McMannen, Christy)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of John M Popilock for Darbara Gallow,John M Popilock for Darryl D Gallow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/25/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jordan S Friter for Darbara Gallow,Jordan S Friter for Darryl D Gallow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/25/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for John M. Popilock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5435678) by Darbara Gallow, Darryl D Gallow. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Bryant, Misti)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Jordan S. Friter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5435661) by Darbara Gallow, Darryl D Gallow. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Bryant, Misti)
January 18, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C identifying Corporate Parent Bridgestone Americas Inc for Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C; Corporate Parent Bridgestone Corporation for Bridgestone Americas Inc. (aty,McMannen, Christy)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C.(aty,McMannen, Christy)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/5/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/4/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christy L McMannen on behalf of Bridgestone Americas Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 3, 2023 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:23-cv-00007 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:23-cv-00007. Case assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number 202210856 A (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5412843) filed by Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc, Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C, Bridgestone Americas Inc. (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 attachment to civil cover sheet)(Attorney Christy L McMannen added to party Bridgestone Americas Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christy L McMannen added to party Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Christy L McMannen added to party Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christy L McMannen added to party Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C(pty:dft))(aty,McMannen, Christy) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/4/2023) (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallow et al v. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl D Gallow
Represented By: Misti Landry Bryant
Represented By: John M Popilock
Represented By: Jordan S Friter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darbara Gallow
Represented By: Misti Landry Bryant
Represented By: John M Popilock
Represented By: Jordan S Friter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations L L C
Represented By: Christy L McMannen
Represented By: Kyle Demoine Anderson
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Represented By: R Todd Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire L L C
Represented By: Christy L McMannen
Represented By: Kyle Demoine Anderson
Represented By: R Todd Marshall
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Firestone Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Firestone Americas Holding Inc
Represented By: Christy L McMannen
Represented By: Kyle Demoine Anderson
Represented By: R Todd Marshall
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Inc
Represented By: Christy L McMannen
Represented By: Kyle Demoine Anderson
Represented By: R Todd Marshall
Represented By: T Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?