George v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenereis George
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2024cv00664
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant Brief due by 8/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript)(aty,Brown, Shannon) Modified to indicate manual attachment received on 7/10/2024 (Williams, K).
July 10, 2024 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Shannon Thornhill Brown on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security regarding #6 Answer to Complaint. Pursuant to LR 5.7.01, the electronic version of this manual attachment is considered the original. (crt,Williams, K)
July 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Clark on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Jonathan Clark added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft)) (aty,Clark, Jonathan)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 5/21/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenereis George. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cloos, Edward)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Kenereis George. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Edward J Cloos, III added to party Kenereis George(pty:pla))(aty,Cloos, Edward)
May 20, 2024 SERVICE of Complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security through the United States Attorney's Office by the Courts electronic case management system pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security actions Under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/20/2024, answer due 7/19/2024. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 20, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenereis George
Represented By: Edward J Cloos, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jonathan Clark
Represented By: Shannon Thornhill Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?